This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2020 at 07:50:18 (UTC).

Jeffery R. Werner et al v. BN Media, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Jeffery R Werner filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BN Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Henry C. Morgan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00610

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Henry C. Morgan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffery R. Werner

Incredible Features Inc.

Defendants

BN Media, LLC.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Saba A. Basria

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Mathew K. Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive, Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Brian Nelson Casey

Attorney at Taylor Walker PC

555 E Main St, Suite 1300

Norfolk, VA 23510

Defendant Attorneys

Craig J. Mariam

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP (CA-NA)

633 West Fifth Street, 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nancy E. Wolff

Attorney at Cowan DeBaets Abrahams and Sheppard LLP

9595 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Damon William Wright

Attorney at Venable LLP (DC)

600 Massachusetts Ave., Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Ryan Michael Poteet

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

1101 King Street, Suite 520

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

#31

(#31) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/2/20. (lbax, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#30

(#30) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery R. Werner.(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

29 #1

Memorandum In Support

#29

(#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BN Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Wright, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice for Saba Ali Basria as to Jeffery R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/03/2019. (bboy, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#27

(#27) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Saba Ali Basria and Certification of Local Counsel Brian N. Casey Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6960643. by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Nelson Casey on behalf of Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Poteet on behalf of BN Media, LLC. (Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Wright on behalf of BN Media, LLC. (Wright, Damon) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner, (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

#2

(#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BN Media, LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

41 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/2/20. (lbax, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffery R. Werner.(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • Refer for 16(b) (tamarm) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by BN Media, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support)(Wright, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting #27 Motion for Pro hac vice for Saba Ali Basria as to Jeffery R. Werner and Incredible Features Inc. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/03/2019. (bboy, ) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Saba Ali Basria and Certification of Local Counsel Brian N. Casey Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6960643. by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Nelson Casey on behalf of Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Poteet on behalf of BN Media, LLC. (Poteet, Ryan) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Wright on behalf of BN Media, LLC. (Wright, Damon) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CLERK'S NOTICE of local counsel requirement mailed to foreign counsel. (tamarm) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy E Wolff counsel for Defendant BN Media, LLC.. Adding Nancy E. Wolff as counsel of record for BN Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC. (Attorney Nancy E Wolff added to party BN Media, LLC.(pty:dft))(Wolff, Nancy) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant BN Media, LLC. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeremy McGee - President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Basria, Saba) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BN Media, LLC. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner, (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23814246 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffery R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) [Transferred from California Central on 11/8/2019.] (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Incredible Feature Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Evelyn Wolff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig J Mariam

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Poteet