This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/27/2019 at 07:10:37 (UTC).

Jeffery R. Werner et al v. BN Media, LLC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Jeffery R Werner filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against BN Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04613

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeffery R. Werner

Incredible Features Inc.

Defendants

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

BN Media, LLC.

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Saba A Basria

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Defendant Attorney

Nancy E Wolff

Attorney at Cowan DeBaets Abrahams and Sheppard

41 Madison Avenue 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10010

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC. (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#13

(#13) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #12 filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC.. (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

12 #5

Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss

12 #4

Exhibit A to McGee Affidavit

12 #3

Affidavit of Jeremy McGee

12 #2

Exhibit A-C to Wolff Declaration

12 #1

Declaration of Nancy E. Wolff

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by defendant BN Media, LLC.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy E. Wolff, #2 Exhibit A-C to Wolff Declaration, #3 Affidavit of Jeremy McGee, #4 Exhibit A to McGee Affidavit, #5 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#11

(#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BN Media, LLC. answer now due 7/24/2019, filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC..(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#10

(#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy E Wolff counsel for Defendant BN Media, LLC.. Adding Nancy E. Wolff as counsel of record for BN Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC. (Attorney Nancy E Wolff added to party BN Media, LLC.(pty:dft))(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#9

(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant BN Media, LLC. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeremy McGee - President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Basria, Saba) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BN Media, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23814246 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffery R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC. (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint #12 filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC.. (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by defendant BN Media, LLC.. Motion set for hearing on 10/25/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nancy E. Wolff, #2 Exhibit A-C to Wolff Declaration, #3 Affidavit of Jeremy McGee, #4 Exhibit A to McGee Affidavit, #5 Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss) (Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to BN Media, LLC. answer now due 7/24/2019, filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC..(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy E Wolff counsel for Defendant BN Media, LLC.. Adding Nancy E. Wolff as counsel of record for BN Media, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant BN Media, LLC. (Attorney Nancy E Wolff added to party BN Media, LLC.(pty:dft))(Wolff, Nancy) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc., upon Defendant BN Media, LLC. served on 6/3/2019, answer due 6/24/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeremy McGee - President in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Basria, Saba) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant BN Media, LLC. (ghap) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Incredible Features Inc., Jeffery R. Werner. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23814246 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jeffery R. Werner, Incredible Features Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Incredible Features Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party Jeffery R. Werner(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Incredible Feature Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nancy Evelyn Wolff