This case was last updated from PACER on 02/13/2021 at 19:10:01 (UTC).

Jefferson v. Jones et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Jefferson filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Jones. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy L. Brooks and Erin L. Wiedemann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-06149

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

Referral Judge

Erin L. Wiedemann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aaris D. Jefferson

Hot Springs, AR 71913-9542

Defendants

Members of US Congress

John Doe Director of DEA

Judge Barry Bryant

Jack Ma

William Barr

Chief Steven Elrod

John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service

Jeff Bezos

Nurse Betty

Doe ADC Director

Donald Trump

Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director

Trent Daniels

Gina Haskell

Asa Hutchinson

John Doe Director of CDC

General Assembly of Arkansas Members

Dr. Absalom Tilloy

Lieutenant Stapleton

15 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Aaris Jefferson at 231 Oak Street Hot Springs, AR. 71901 including #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaris D. Jefferson, #5 Notice of Change of Address. No new address available. New Address due by 2/22/2021. (jlm) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaris D. Jefferson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Aaris D. Jefferson. There are no documents to resend. (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2020. (mjm) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit deadline date (mjm). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

1 #1

Motion to Proceed Pro Se

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryan Achorn, William Barr, Tim Beckham, Betty, Jeff Bezos, Barry Bryant, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, Robert T. Dawson, Doe ADC Director, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of DEA, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Steven Elrod, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Gina Haskell, Hernsberger, Susan O. Hickey, Asa Hutchinson, Briggette Johnson, Joe Jones, Michelle Lawrence, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Members of US Congress, Members of US Senate, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Ohms (Holmes), Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Absalom Tilloy, Donald Trump, Homer Wright, filed by Aaris D. Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Pro Se)(mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned as Undeliverable marked Return to Sender. Mail originally sent to Aaris Jefferson at 231 Oak Street Hot Springs, AR. 71901 including #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Aaris D. Jefferson, #5 Notice of Change of Address. No new address available. New Address due by 2/22/2021. (jlm) (Entered: 01/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Aaris D. Jefferson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of Address for Aaris D. Jefferson. There are no documents to resend. (lw) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING COMPLAINT DEFICIENCY. After review of the Complaint, it is determined that the Plaintiff did not submit the complaint on the court-approved form for this District. For this reason, Plaintiff is directed to submit an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to mail the Plaintiff a court-approved 1983 form.In the Amended Complaint, Plaintiff must write short, plain statements telling the Court: the constitutional right Plaintiff believes was violated;the name of the Defendant who violated the right;exactly what the Defendant did or failed to do;how the action or inaction of that Defendant is connected to the violation of the constitutional rights;and what specific injury Plaintiff suffered because of the misconduct of that Defendant. See Rizzo v. Goode, 423 U.S. 362,371-72,377 (1976);Fed.R.Civ.P.8. Plaintiff must repeat this process for each person he has named as a Defendant. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that he must affirmatively link the conduct of each named Defendant with the specific injury he suffered. If he fails to do so, the allegations against that Defendant will be dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff is also ADVISED that he may ONLY address injuries to himself.Plaintiff must clearly designate on the face of the document that it is a First Amended Complaint. The First Amended Complaint must be retyped or rewritten in its entirety on the court-approved form. You may not refer back to any part of the original complaint. A First Amended Complaint supersedes, or takes the place of, the original Complaint. After amendment, the Court will treat the original Complaint as nonexistent. Any cause of action that was raised in the original Complaint is waived if it is not raised in the First Amended Complaint. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to return the Amended Complaint to the Court by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Amended Complaint due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on December 16, 2020. (klk) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed IFP application. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. Completed IFP due by 1/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Mark E. Ford on December 15, 2020. (mjm) Modified on 12/15/2020 to edit deadline date (mjm). (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Bryan Achorn, William Barr, Tim Beckham, Betty, Jeff Bezos, Barry Bryant, Trent Daniels, Richard Davis, Robert T. Dawson, Doe ADC Director, Doe Arkansas Community Corrections Director, John Doe Director of CDC, John Doe Director of DEA, John Doe Director of U.S. Secret Service, Steven Elrod, General Assembly of Arkansas Members, Gina Haskell, Hernsberger, Susan O. Hickey, Asa Hutchinson, Briggette Johnson, Joe Jones, Michelle Lawrence, Jack Ma, Mike McCormick, Members of US Congress, Members of US Senate, Members of the Arkansas Bar Association, Ohms (Holmes), Leslie Rutledge, Stapleton, Absalom Tilloy, Donald Trump, Homer Wright, filed by Aaris D. Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Motion to Proceed Pro Se)(mjm) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Members of US Congress is a litigant