This case was last updated from PACER on 09/18/2020 at 11:03:54 (UTC).

Jefferson v. CR Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Jefferson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CR Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is J Michelle Childs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02685

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J Michelle Childs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheri L Jefferson

Defendants

Does 1 through 10

CR Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Walter F Harris, III

Attorney at Harris Law Firm LLC

115 River Landing Drive, Suite 102

Charleston, SC 29492

Stephen Grant Daniel

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

225 Ottley Drive Ne, Suite 110

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Marvin Connor

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough (Ch)

151 Meeting Street, Sixth Floor

Charleston, SC 29401

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/10/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/17/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#10

(#10) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/8/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/4/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/4/2021, Discovery due by 2/3/2021, Motions due by 2/17/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/30/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/17/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#9

(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc.'s and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

6 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

6 #1

Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission

#6

(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Grant Daniel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9251513) by Sheri L Jefferson. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Harris, Walter) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#5

(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sheri L Jefferson.(Harris, Walter) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (asni, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, Does 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9228772.), filed by Sheri L Jefferson. Service due by 10/19/2020(asni, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 2/10/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/17/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 9/8/2020, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/21/2020, Rule 26 Report due by 9/21/2020, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2020, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/2/2020, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/4/2021, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/4/2021, Discovery due by 2/3/2021, Motions due by 2/17/2021, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 4/30/2021, Jury Selection Deadline 6/1/2021, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/17/2020. (asni, ) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc.'s and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc.(Connor, Andrew) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 7/31/2020.(asni, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stephen Grant Daniel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-9251513) by Sheri L Jefferson. Response to Motion due by 8/14/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)No proposed order.(Harris, Walter) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Sheri L Jefferson.(Harris, Walter) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (asni, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CR Bard Inc. (asni, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, Does 1 through 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-9228772.), filed by Sheri L Jefferson. Service due by 10/19/2020(asni, ) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less