This case was last updated from PACER on 05/14/2021 at 10:16:13 (UTC).

Jefferson Loft LLC v. Construction Enterprises Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/15/2021 Jefferson Loft LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Construction Enterprises Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is L Scott Coogler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00389

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

L Scott Coogler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Loft LLC

Defendants

Phoenix Framing LLC

Construction Enterprises Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph D Leavens

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

1901 6Th Avenue North, P O Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201

Charles A Burkhart

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

P O Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35201-0306

Michael Paul Taunton

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM, LLP

P.O. Box 306

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Howard K Glick

Attorney at SIMPSON MCMAHAN GLICK & BURFORD PLLC

2700 Highway 280, Suite 203W

Birmingham, AL 35223

Bryan A Grayson

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE, PC

880 Montclair Road, Ste. 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

Laura Clare Bell

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

880 Montclair Road, Ste. 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

E Britton Monroe

Attorney at LLOYD, GRAY, WHITEHEAD & MONROE PC

880 Montclair Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35213

 

Court Documents

#24

RESTRICTED

23 #1

Exhibit Supplemental Exhibit to Response

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Jefferson Loft LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Redacted)Supplemental Exhibit to Response)(Leavens, Joseph) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

#19

(#19) REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Phoenix Framing LLC re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2022. Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2022. Bench Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/30/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#17

(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jefferson Loft LLC. (Leavens, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Bell, Laura) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#6

(#19) REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Phoenix Framing LLC re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Phoenix Framing LLC Consent to Removal

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

#1

Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3810849 (B4601112410). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Jefferson Loft LLC, filed by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Phoenix Framing LLC Consent to Removal, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(KEK). (Grayson, Bryan) Modified on 4/2/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ***Document Sealed*** (Unredacted) Supplemental Exhibit to #23 RESPONSE re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (FILED UNDER SEAL pursuant to Order 22) (MEB2) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE to Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #17 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Jefferson Loft LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Redacted)Supplemental Exhibit to Response)(Leavens, Joseph) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) TEXT ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #17 is GRANTED. The plaintiff is DIRECTED to file two versions of its response brief. The plaintiff may file the first version under seal. The second version, which the plaintiff may not file under seal, must redact or "black out" whatever information the plaintiff contends is confidential or proprietary. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 05/07/21. (CMB) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) TEXT ORDER: Attorney Laura C. Bell moved to withdraw from her representation of Defendant Construction Enterprises, Inc. Her motion #15 is GRANTED. Laura C. Bell is TERMINATED as an attorney of record. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 5/7/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TEXT ORDER: The defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #16 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on 05/07/21. (CMB) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY Brief filed by Defendant Phoenix Framing LLC re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2022. Joint Status Report due by 4/14/2022. Bench Trial set for 8/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Federal Building, Tuscaloosa, AL before Judge L Scott Coogler. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/30/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Jefferson Loft LLC. (Leavens, Joseph) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Bell, Laura) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Two motions are before the Court: Defendant Phoenix Framing LLC's Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. ( #6 and #8 ) Plaintiff has fourteen (14) days from this Order's entry to respond to Defendant Phoenix Framing LLC's motion #6 . Plaintiff will then have seven (7) days to file a reply. Defendants have fourteen (14) days from this Orders entry to respond to Plaintiff's motion #8 . Plaintiff does not have leave to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/14/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand by Jefferson Loft LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Taunton, Michael) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Brief re #6 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Glick, Howard) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Phoenix Framing LLC. (Glick, Howard) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3810849 (B4601112410). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Jefferson Loft LLC, filed by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Phoenix Framing LLC Consent to Removal, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(KEK). (Grayson, Bryan) Modified on 4/2/2021 (MRR, ). (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Defendant Construction Enterprises' Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss is before the Court. #3 Plaintiff has fourteen (14) days from this Order's entry to respond. Defendant Construction Enterprises will then have seven (7) days to file a reply. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 4/1/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Grayson, Bryan) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Grayson, Bryan) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge L Scott Coogler on 3/19/2021. (PSM) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Jefferson Loft LLC, filed by Construction Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4 - Phoenix Framing LLC Consent to Removal, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(KEK) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSTRUCTION ENTERPRISES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph D Leavens

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles A Burkhart(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Paul Taunton