This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:22:42 (UTC).

Jefferson Chalmers Non-Profit Senior Housing Corporation, d/b/a Phillip C. Sims Senior Housing Apartments v. Kinsale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Jefferson Chalmers Non-Profit Senior Housing Corporation, d/b/a Phillip C Sims Senior Housing Apartments filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Kinsale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are George Caram Steeh and Elizabeth A. Stafford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13408

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Caram Steeh

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Stafford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Chalmers Non-Profit Senior Housing Corporation, d/b/a Phillip C. Sims Senior Housing Apartments

Defendant

Kinsale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert I. McCoy

Attorney at McCoy & Associates

2381 E. Stadium Boulevard

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

Defendant Attorney

Patrick B. Green

Attorney at Dickinson Wright

500 Woodward Avenue, Suite 4000

Detroit, MI 48226-3425

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement. Response due by 1/17/2020, Reply due by 1/31/2020. (BSau) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

7 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

7 #1

Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Kinsale's #5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint. Answer due by 12/27/2019. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#5

(#5) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Senior Housing's Complaint. Answer due by 12/16/2019. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Kinsale Insurance Company (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kinsale Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-013180-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7491538 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Notice of Determination of Motion Without Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement. Response due by 1/17/2020, Reply due by 1/31/2020. (BSau) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion for More Definite Statement by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Granting Kinsale's #5 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint. Answer due by 12/27/2019. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Senior Housing's Complaint. Answer due by 12/16/2019. Signed by District Judge George Caram Steeh. (BSau) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond (Unopposed) by Kinsale Insurance Company. (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Kinsale Insurance Company (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kinsale Insurance Company from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 19-013180-CZ. Receipt No: 0645-7491538 - Fee: $ 400 [Previously dismissed case: No] (Green, Patrick) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.