This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2021 at 11:20:26 (UTC).

JEFFERS v. ASTRAZENECA LP et al

Case Summary

On June 22, 2021,  Betty Jeffers, as proposed representative of the Estate of Vincent Jeffers, deceased, (“Jeffers”, or “Plaintiff”) filed a personal injury-medical/pharmaceutical product liability lawsuit against Astrazeneca LP, Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals LP, Merck & Co. Inc. d/b/a Merck, Sharp & Dohme Corporation, the Procter & Gamble Company, and the Procter & Gamble Manufacturing Company, (collectively, “Defendants”) seeking damages for the alleged wrongful death of Vincent Jeffers relating to the use of the Defendants’ products. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the District of New Jersey with Judge Mark Falk and Judge Claire C. Cecchi presiding.

 

In its complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, to the best of Plaintiff’s knowledge, “Plaintiff/Decedent used PPI Product(s) during the following time period: Approximately 2000 – 2020. Plaintiff/Decedent used Prilosec and suffered injuries of Chronic Kidney Disease (CKD), End Stage Renal Disease (ESRD), Dialysis, and Death.”

 

The Plaintiff laid down fifteen claims for relief. The following claims have been alleged: strict product liability, strict product liability – design defect, strict product liability – failure to warn, negligence, negligence per se, breach of express warranty, breach of implied warranty, negligent misrepresentation, fraud and fraudulent misrepresentation, fraudulent concealment, violation of state consumer protection laws of the state of Mississippi, and wrongful death.

 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court to issue a judgment against the Defendants for compensatory damages, punitive damages, interest, costs of suit, and such further relief as the Court deems equitable and just, and as set forth in the Master Long Form Complaint and Jury Demand, as appropriate.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-12845

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire C. Cecchi

Referral Judge

Mark Falk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BETTY JEFFERS

Defendants

ASTRAZENECA LP

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY

MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION

ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP

THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY

In Re

PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAUL J. PENNOCK

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

850 3Rd Ave, Suite 402

Brooklyn, NY 11232

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12567984) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BETTY JEFFERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketMember Case Direct File on 6/22/2021, for MDL 2789 PROTON-PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (No. II) (lag, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketFor all Case Management Orders #click here (lag, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (lag, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ASTRAZENECA LP, ASTRAZENECA PHARMACEUTICALS LP, MERCK & CO. INC. D/B/A MERCK, SHARP & DOHME CORPORATION, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, THE PROCTER & GAMBLE MANUFACTURING COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12567984) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BETTY JEFFERS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PENNOCK, PAUL) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where PROTON PUMP INHIBITOR PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION (NO. II) is a litigant