This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 07:39:15 (UTC).

Jeff v. Odum

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Jeff filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Odum. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00369

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ricky Jeff

Waycross, GA 31503

Respondents

Odum

Deputy Warden Roy Odum

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Clint Christopher Malcolm

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334

Paula K. Smith

Attorney at Department of Law - 03

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ricky Jeff. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#2

(#2) Deficiency Notice re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filing fee has not been paid. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Jeff. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER Transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/31/2022. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/31/2022)

5 #5

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

5 #1

*Restricted*

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of the petition and this Order by certified mail to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Georgia. Respondent shall (1) show cause within 60 days of the receipt of this Order why the petition should not be granted, and (2) transmit to this Court such pleadings, transcripts, and decisions as are available and required to determine the issues raised. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 02/08/2022. (jkb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Roy Odum (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Roy Odum (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketCertified Mail Returned Receipt re Clerks Certificate of Mailing for Deputy Warden Roy Odum (jkb) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Clint Christopher Malcolm on behalf of Roy Odum (Malcolm, Clint) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Paula K. Smith on behalf of Roy Odum (Smith, Paula) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketCertified Mail Returned Receipt from Attorney General re Clerks Certificate of Mailing (jkb) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Attorney General State of Georgia (CMRR#70183090000213388683), Ricky Jeff, Roy Odum(CMRR#70183090000213388690) re #6 Order on Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jkb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #3 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transmit a copy of the petition and this Order by certified mail to Respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Georgia. Respondent shall (1) show cause within 60 days of the receipt of this Order why the petition should not be granted, and (2) transmit to this Court such pleadings, transcripts, and decisions as are available and required to determine the issues raised. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 02/08/2022. (jkb) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (aar) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 5:22-cv-00003. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Transferring this case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Georgia, Atlanta Division. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/31/2022. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ricky Jeff. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (gmh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 2/1/2022 re: #2 Deficiency Notice. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Deficiency Notice re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Filing fee has not been paid. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Ricky Jeff. (csr) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 1/31/2022.] (Entered: 01/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLINT C MALCOLM