This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/06/2021 at 09:50:55 (UTC).

Jedrzejczyk v. Skillz Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Jedrzejczyk filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Skillz Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-03450

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas Jedrzejczyk

Defendants

Andrew Paradise

Miriam Aguirre

Casey Chafkin

Skillz Inc.

Scott Henry

Harry Sloan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert C. Schubert

Willem F. Jonckheer

Andrea Farah

Christian Levis

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Rawlinson

Daniel Robert Gherardi

Hilary Hellmuth Mattis

Nathan E Taylor

 

Court Documents

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

#10

#9

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#27) ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting #26 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nathan Taylor. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#26) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16110797.) filed by Miriam Aguirre, Casey Chafkin, Scott Henry, Andrew Paradise, Skillz Inc., Harry Sloan. (Taylor, Nathan) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#25) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2021. Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 8/5/2021 is continued to 12/16/2021 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/21/2021. (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#24) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Respond to Complaint and Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Miriam Aguirre, Casey Chafkin, Scott Henry, Andrew Paradise, Skillz Inc., Harry Sloan. (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skillz Inc. (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) Certificate of Interested Entities by Miriam Aguirre, Casey Chafkin, Scott Henry, Andrew Paradise, Skillz Inc., Harry Sloan (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Robert Gherardi (Gherardi, Daniel) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Hilary Hellmuth Mattis (Mattis, Hilary) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Rawlinson (Rawlinson, Matthew) (Filed on 6/21/2021) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Thomas Jedrzejczyk. Service waived by Harry Sloan waiver sent on 6/10/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Levis, Christian) (Filed on 6/15/2021) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
05/19/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-15986138.) filed by Thomas Jedrzejczyk. (Farah, Andrea) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) NOTICE by Thomas Jedrzejczyk of Publication of Securities Class Action Notice (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Entities by Thomas Jedrzejczyk (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021

Docket(#7) CLERK'S NOTICE RE REASSIGNED CASE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Richard Seeborg upon reassignment. Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. All parties shall appear by videoconference using log-in instructions the Court will provide in advance. For a copy of Judge Seeborg's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (clS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Richard Seeborg for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to case, Correction of clerical error in assignment.. Signed by Clerk on 5/11/21. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Miriam Aguirre, Casey Chafkin, Scott Henry, Andrew Paradise, Skillz Inc., Harry Sloan. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/29/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/5/2021 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021

Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/24/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15942913.). Filed byThomas Jedrzejczyk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jonckheer, Willem) (Filed on 5/7/2021) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less