This case was last updated from PACER on 04/04/2020 at 08:54:56 (UTC).

Jeanette Jaime v. CMK Cielo, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2020 Jeanette Jaime filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against CMK Cielo, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00233

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeanette Jaime

Defendants

CMK Cielo, LLC

Does 1-10

Desert Medical Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Phyl Grace

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorneys

Attashin Safari

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Karin Bohmholdt

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

Alana Christina Srour

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

James G Warren

Attorney at Kramer Deboer and Keane LLP

74770 Highway 111 Suite 201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

Jeffrey G Keane

Attorney at Kramer deBoer and Keane

74770 Highway 111 Suite 201

Indian Wells, CA 92210

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

15 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Cert and Not Interested Parties

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Proof of Service

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 6/8/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (iva) (Entered: 03/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Deendant CMK Cielo, LLC, identifying CMK Cielo LLC. (Bohmholdt, Karin) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant CMK Cielo, LLC.(Bohmholdt, Karin) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Desert Medical Group, Inc., (Keane, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Desert Medical Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cert and Not Interested Parties)(Attorney Jeffrey G Keane added to party Desert Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Keane, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 served on 2/19/2020. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Desert Medical Group, Inc. answer now due 3/27/2020; CMK Cielo, LLC answer now due 3/27/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Desert Medical Group, Inc.; CMK Cielo, LLC.(Attorney Attashin Safari added to party CMK Cielo, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Attashin Safari added to party Desert Medical Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Safari, Attashin) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Appearance #10 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime, upon Defendant Desert Medical Group, Inc. served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Michael Fate in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Price, Dennis) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime (Attorney Amanda Lockhart Seabock added to party Jeanette Jaime(pty:pla))(Seabock, Amanda) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime, upon Defendant CMK Cielo, LLC served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon National Registered Agents, Inc-Jessie, intake specialist in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants CMK Cielo, LLC, Desert Medical Group, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jeanette Jaime. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeanette Jaime. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25260257 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Jeanette Jaime. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Jeanette Jaime(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Desert Medical Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Phyl Grace

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dennis Jay Price, II

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond George Ballister, Jr.