This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2023 at 15:36:19 (UTC).

JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED v. LUPIN LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against LUPIN LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley R. Chesler and Jessica S. Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00329

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley R. Chesler

Referral Judge

Jessica S. Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED

Defendants and Counter Claimants

LUPIN LTD.

LUPIN INC.

LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES MICHAEL LIZZA

SARAH ANN SULLIVAN

WILLIAM C. BATON

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

JAMES S. RICHTER

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13973596) , Related Case Selected, filed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#3

(#3) Letter from Charles M. Lizza to the Clerk. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#7

(#7) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mxw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

7 #1

Complaint

#8

(#8) Application for Refund of Fees from from Charles M. Lizza re #1 Complaint, (finance notified).. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#9

(#9) Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Melissa E. Rhoads on 02/07/2023. (mls) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#12

(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#13

(#13) Letter from Jazz to the Hon. Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#14

(#14) CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER that Civil Action Nos. 21-14271 and 23-329 (the "Consolidated Actions") are consolidated for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court; that all filings in the Consolidated Actions shall use the above caption on this Order; that all filings going forward shall be filed in Civil Action No. 21-14271 and that Civil Action No. 23-329 shall be administratively terminated by the Clerk's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/15/2023. (sm) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

02/16/2023

Docket***Civil Case Terminated -- consolidated with 21-14271 for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court. (sm) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) CONSOLIDATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER that Civil Action Nos. 21-14271 and 23-329 (the "Consolidated Actions") are consolidated for all purposes, including discovery, case management, and trial, subject to further order of the Court; that all filings in the Consolidated Actions shall use the above caption on this Order; that all filings going forward shall be filed in Civil Action No. 21-14271 and that Civil Action No. 23-329 shall be administratively terminated by the Clerk's office. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen on 2/15/2023. (sm) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) Letter from Jazz to the Hon. Jessica S. Allen, U.S.M.J.. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED by LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD..(RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES S. RICHTER on behalf of LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. (RICHTER, JAMES) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Melissa E. Rhoads on 02/07/2023. (mls) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Application for Refund of Fees from from Charles M. Lizza re #1 Complaint, (finance notified).. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The #3 Application for Refund of Filing Fee filed by CHARLES LIZZA on 1/23/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Letter. Please resubmit the Application using the event "Application for Refund of Fees" found under Civil -> Other Filings -> Other Documents to avoid further delay in processing. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (mxw) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mxw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, ) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SARAH ANN SULLIVAN on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (SULLIVAN, SARAH) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM C. BATON on behalf of JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED (BATON, WILLIAM) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/24/2023

DocketJudge Stanley R. Chesler and Magistrate Judge Jessica S. Allen added. (ps) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Letter from Charles M. Lizza to the Clerk. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/20/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against LUPIN INC., LUPIN LTD., LUPIN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13973596) , Related Case Selected, filed by JAZZ PHARMACEUTICALS IRELAND LIMITED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LIZZA, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less