Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. v. Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3614091.) - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-I, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 8,731,963 B1 ;10,758,488 B2 ;10,813,885 B1 ;10,959,956 B2 ;10,966,931 B2. (apk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals, plc for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (apk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Avadel US Holdings, Inc. served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Avadel Management Corporation served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. (Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc..(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth G. Schuler, Marc N. Zubick, Alex Grabowski, and Sarah W. Wang - filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra M. Joyce on behalf of Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #13 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Kenneth G. Schuler, Marc N. Zubick, Alex Grabowski, and Sarah W. Wang filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc., Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/4/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Dominic Cerrito, Eric C. Stops, Evangeline Shih, Andrew S. Chalson, Gabriel P. Brier and Frank C. Calvosa - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney F. Dominic Cerrito, Eric C. Stops, Evangeline Shih, Andrew S. Chalson, Gabriel P. Brier and Frank C. Calvosa filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/7/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Alex M. Grabowski for Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and Avadel US Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Gabriel P. Brier,Eric C. Stops,F. Dominic Cerrito for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (myr) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Frank C. Calvosa for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (apk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #11 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Blumenfeld, Jack) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • Docket(#17) ORAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall confer regarding proposed dates in the scheduling order and shall submit a proposed order, including a proposal for the length and timing of trial, to the Court no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties are to use the Court's form scheduling order, which is posted at http://www.ded.uscourts.gov (see Chambers, Judge Noreika, Forms). If there are disputes or issues that the Court needs to address in the proposed scheduling order, the parties shall direct the Court to the paragraph numbers in which those appear in a cover letter to the Court. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/21/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Evangeline Shih for Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bornali Rashmi Borah and Herman Yue - filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc.. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Marc N. Zubick for Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC,and Avadel US Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Sarah W. Wang for Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation,Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and Avadel US Holdings, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (srs) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bornali Rashmi Borah and Herman Yue filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc., Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/9/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less