This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/28/2023 at 19:08:57 (UTC).

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/10/2021 Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory B. Williams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01594

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory B. Williams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited

Counter Claimant and Defendant

Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jack B. Blumenfeld

Jeremy A. Tigan

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel M. Silver

Adam R. Brausa

Alexandra M. Joyce

Katherine E. McNutt

Kira A. Davis

Rebecca E. Weires

Alan Devlin

Andrew T. Jones

Daralyn J. Durie

Herman H. Yue

Alex M. Grabowski

Audra Sawyer

Franco Benyamin

Kenneth G. Schuler

Marc N. Zubick

Sarah Propst

5 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#212

(#212) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Reply Expert Reports to June 30, 2023 - filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

211 #1

Exhibits A-C

211 #211

Main Document

#210

(#210) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Jazz Pharmaceuticals' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-15), (2) Jazz Pharmaceuticals' Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 82-98), and (3) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Notice of Deposition to Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

209 #9

Exhibit 6 - Redline C.A. 21-1594

209 #8

Exhibit 5 - Redline C.A. 21-1138

209 #6

Exhibits A-C to Amended Complaint C.A. 21-1594

209 #2

Exhibits A-F to Amended Complaint C.A. 21-691

209 #1

Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint C.A. 21-691

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to meet and confer and submit a revised proposed schedule consistent with the Court's November 29, 2021 Oral Order to December 10, 2021 - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Management Corporation on 11/12/2021; Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel US Holdings, Inc. on 11/12/2021. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc for Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,147,782 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-E

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and Avadel US Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3740825.) - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

203 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/23/2023

DocketSO ORDERED, re (326 in 1:21-cv-00691-GBW, 212 in 1:21-cv-01594-GBW, 217 in 1:21-cv-01138-GBW) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Reply Expert Reports to June 30, 2023 filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/23/23. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00691-GBW, 1:21-cv-01138-GBW, 1:21-cv-01594-GBW (ntl) (Entered: 06/23/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#212) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to submit Reply Expert Reports to June 30, 2023 - filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 06/21/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#211) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC- filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketSO ORDERED, re (323 in 1:21-cv-00691-GBW, 214 in 1:21-cv-01138-GBW, 209 in 1:21-cv-01594-GBW) STIPULATION to Amend Complaints filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Gregory B. Williams on 6/9/23. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00691-GBW, 1:21-cv-01138-GBW, 1:21-cv-01594-GBW (ntl) (Entered: 06/09/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#210) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Jazz Pharmaceuticals' Second Set of Interrogatories (Nos. 9-15), (2) Jazz Pharmaceuticals' Fifth Set of Requests for the Production of Documents and Things (Nos. 82-98), and (3) Plaintiffs' Supplemental Notice of Deposition to Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc..(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/08/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#209) STIPULATION to Amend Complaints by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint C.A. 21-691, #2 Exhibits A-F to Amended Complaint C.A. 21-691, #3 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint C.A. 21-1138, #4 Exhibits A-D to Amended Complaint C.A. 21-1138, #5 Exhibit 3 - Amended Complaint C.A. 21-1594, #6 Exhibits A-C to Amended Complaint C.A. 21-1594, #7 Exhibit 4 - Redline C.A. 21-691, #8 Exhibit 5 - Redline C.A. 21-1138, #9 Exhibit 6 - Redline C.A. 21-1594)(Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/08/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#208) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Second Set of Requests for Admissions, and (2) Defendant's Supplemental Notice of Deposition of Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(6) filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/02/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/31/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#207) NOTICE OF SERVICE of (1) Defendant's Eighth Set of Requests for Production of Documents and Things to Plaintiffs, and (2) Defendant's Eighth Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/31/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023

DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Adam R. Brausa for Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00691-GBW, 1:21-cv-01138-GBW, 1:21-cv-01594-GBW (mkr) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(#206) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Second Amended Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(A) filed by Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals, LLC.(Joyce, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/10/2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
236 More Docket Entries
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M. Silver on behalf of Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel US Holdings, Inc. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021

DocketSO ORDERED re (23 in 1:21-cv-01138-MN, 7 in 1:21-cv-01594-MN, 66 in 1:21-cv-00691-MN) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to meet and confer and submit a revised proposed schedule consistent with the Court's November 29, 2021 Oral Order to December 10, 2021. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 12/6/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/06/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for the parties to meet and confer and submit a revised proposed schedule consistent with the Court's November 29, 2021 Oral Order to December 10, 2021 - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited, Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Tigan, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2021

Docket(#6) ORAL ORDER re (60 in 1:21-cv-00691-MN, 19 in 1:21-cv-01138-MN) Letter - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that these three actions (21-691, 21-1138, & 21-1594) will proceed on the same schedule with the pretrial conference and trial dates of October 23, 2023 and October 30, 2023 remaining in place. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall serve their final contentions (i.e., final infringement and invalidity contentions, as well as final non-infringement and validity contentions) at least three weeks before Plaintiff serves its opening claim construction brief. The parties are encouraged to exchange proposed claim terms and proposed constructions early in the case and certainly prior to the deadline for final contentions. Final contentions shall include a party's contentions under its proposed construction(s), as well as under the opposing construction(s) (if such an alternative contention exists). The joint claim construction chart shall be due one week after the parties have completed their exchange of final contentions, and the joint claim construction brief must be filed at least three weeks before the claim construction hearing. The parties shall leave at least three weeks between the claim construction hearing and the opening of expert discovery. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that, on or before 12/6/2021, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised proposed schedule consistent with this guidance. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 11/29/2021. (dlw) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/17/2021

DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) (Entered: 11/17/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Management Corporation on 11/12/2021; Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC on 11/12/2021; Avadel US Holdings, Inc. on 11/12/2021. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Jazz Pharmaceuticals plc for Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited and Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 11,147,782 B1. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed against Avadel CNS Pharmaceuticals LLC, Avadel Legacy Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Avadel Management Corporation, Avadel Pharmaceuticals PLC, Avadel Specialty Pharmaceuticals, LLC, and Avadel US Holdings, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3740825.) - filed by Jazz Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Jazz Pharmaceuticals Ireland Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nmg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less