This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2021 at 08:18:15 (UTC).

Jazmin Valle et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 Jazmin Valle filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John W. Holcomb and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01131

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John W. Holcomb

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jazmin Valle

Natividad Valle

Defendants

FCA US LLC

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy-Lyn Morse

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steve Mikhov

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Maite Christine Colon

Attorney at Knight Law Group LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorney

Kyle A Fellenz

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

One America Plaza, 600 West Broadway Suite 500

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle, Natividad Valle.. (Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle, Natividad Valle. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Jazmin Valle and Natividad Valle for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle and Natividad Valle. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Jazmin Valle(pty:pla), Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Natividad Valle(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#8

(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 07/11/2021)

#6

(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle, Natividad Valle.. (Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Maite Christine Colon counsel for Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle, Natividad Valle. Adding Maite Colon as counsel of record for Jazmin Valle and Natividad Valle for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs Jazmin Valle and Natividad Valle. (Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Jazmin Valle(pty:pla), Attorney Maite Christine Colon added to party Natividad Valle(pty:pla))(Colon, Maite) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 08/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Other error(s) with document(s): The filing of a Declination Statement of Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge only applies to cases under the "Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program", wherein the initial judge assignment as the presider of the case is assigned to a magistrate judge. This case is not under that program.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (rn) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (iva) (Entered: 07/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNON CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FCA US LLC, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Natividad Valle and Jazmin Valle in Riverside Superior Court on 5/20/2021, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant FCA US LLC identifying FCA US LLC as Corporate Parent. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant FCA US LLC. (Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVR12102341 Receipt No: ACACDC-31588934 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Declaration, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Declaration) (Attorney Kyle A Fellenz added to party FCA US LLC(pty:bkmov))(Fellenz, Kyle) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Anthony Fellenz