This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/29/2023 at 10:50:26 (UTC).

Jawbone Innovations, LLC v. HTC Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/28/2023 Jawbone Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against HTC Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Rodney Gilstrap and Roy S. Payne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00077

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodney Gilstrap

Referral Judge

Roy S. Payne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jawbone Innovations, LLC

Defendant

HTC Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Lambrianakos

Richard Matthew Cowell

Vincent J Rubino, III

Alfred Ross Fabricant

Samuel Franklin Baxter

Jacob Daniel Ostling

Jennifer Leigh Truelove

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against HTC Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9377742.), filed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Daniel Ostling on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Ostling, Jacob) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Matthew Cowell on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Cowell, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

#12

(#12) ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY*** MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Judicial Assistance, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) Modified on 3/30/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/23/2023)

12 #1

Exhibit A - Request for Judicial Assistance

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. HTC Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket***FILED IN ERROR. PER ATTORNEY Document #12, Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory. PLEASE IGNORE.*** (ch, ) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. HTC Corporation waiver sent on 3/28/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***FILED IN ERROR PER ATTORNEY*** MOTION for Issuance of Letters Rogatory by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Request for Judicial Assistance, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabricant, Alfred) Modified on 3/30/2023 (ch, ). (Entered: 03/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Richard Matthew Cowell on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Cowell, Richard) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel Franklin Baxter on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Baxter, Samuel) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Leigh Truelove on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Truelove, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Issued as to HTC Corporation. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob Daniel Ostling on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Ostling, Jacob) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Vincent J Rubino, III on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Rubino, Vincent) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Lambrianakos on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Lambrianakos, Peter) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfred Ross Fabricant on behalf of Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against HTC Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9377742.), filed by Jawbone Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fabricant, Alfred) (Entered: 02/28/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less