Jawandha v. Athira Pharma Inc et al

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7141563) Attorney Benjamin T.G. Nivison added to party Harshdeep Jawandha(pty:pla), filed by Harshdeep Jawandha. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Athira Pharma, Inc., #4 Summons Dr. Leen Kawas, #5 Summons Glenna Mileson, #6 Summons Goldman Sachs & Co., LLC, #7 Summons James A. Johnson, #8 Summons Jefferies LLC, #9 Summons JMP Securities LLC, #10 Summons John M. Fluke, Jr., #11 Summons Joseph Edelman, #12 Summons Stifel, Nicolaus & Company, Incorporated, #13 Summons Tadataka Yamada)(Nivison, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketU.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (RE) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Pro Hac Vice Admission, Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Athira Pharma Inc, Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, James A Johnson, Leen Kawas, Glenna Mileson, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated, Tadataka Yamada. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(RE) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/12/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Harshdeep Jawandha (Nivison, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Charles H. Linehan FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Harshdeep Jawandha (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7165527 (Nivison, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Pavithra Rajesh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Harshdeep Jawandha (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7165566 (Nivison, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Pavithra Rajesh for Plaintiff Harshdeep Jawandha, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gregory Lewis Watts on behalf of Defendants Athira Pharma Inc, Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, James A Johnson, Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada. (Watts, Gregory) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Athira Pharma Inc (Watts, Gregory) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorneys John C Roberts, Jr, Jennifer E.K. Kendrex, Tyre L. Tindall added for for Athira Pharma, Inc., Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada, Joseph Edelman, John M. Fluke, Jr., and James A. Johnson, per #10 Notice of Appearance. (SR) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and Adjourn Status Conference, filed by Defendants Athira Pharma Inc, Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, James A Johnson, Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada. Noting Date 7/29/2021, (Watts, Gregory) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting Parties' #12 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint and Adjourn Status Conference. Within fourteen (14) days of the Court's Order for the appointment of Lead Plaintiff and approval of Lead Counsel, pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1(a)(3)(B), Lead Plaintiff and the Defendants shall meet and confer and submit a schedule for the filing of a consolidated complaint or designation of an operative complaint, and a briefing schedule for Defendants' anticipated motion(s) to dismiss. The October 12, 2021 status conference as set forth in the Status Order is adjourned for the time being. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(SR) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anthony Todaro on behalf of Defendants Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated. (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Stifel Financial Corp., Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated; Corporate Parent Jefferies Group LLC, Other Affiliate Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies LLC; Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co LLC; Corporate Parent JMP Holding LLC, Other Affiliate JMP Investment Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate JMP Group Inc., Other Affiliate JMP Group LLC for JMP Securities LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated (Todaro, Anthony) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAttorney Lianna M Bash added for Goldman Sachs & Co LLC, JMP Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Stifel Nicolaus & Company Incorporated; per #14 Notice of Appearance. (SR) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Thomas S. Zilly. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Filing Stipulated Motion to Consolidate Related Actions Under Local Rule 42 ; filed by Defendants Athira Pharma Inc, Joseph Edelman, John M Fluke Jr, James A Johnson, Glenna Mileson, Tadataka Yamada. (Watts, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE ORDER: The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. All future pleadings, motions, briefs, and other papers shall be filed only in Case No. C21-861 TSZ. The Clerk is DIRECTED to CLOSE Case Nos. C21-862 TSZ and C21-864 TSZ. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (MW) Modified on 8/9/2021 (SRS). (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less