This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:04:48 (UTC).

Jawaid v. GC Services Limited Partnership

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Jawaid filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against GC Services Limited Partnership. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Levy and Eric R. Komitee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06884

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Muhammad Jawaid

Defendant

GC Services Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David M. Barshay

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Craig B. Sanders

Attorney at Barshay Sanders, PLLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Defendant Attorney

Richard J. Perr

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich Voluck

Two Logan Squaire, 100 N. 18Th Street, Suiter 701

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #3

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to GC Services Limited Partnership. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against GC Services Limited Partnership filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12134607 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Muhammad Jawaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Jawaid. GC Services Limited Partnership served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Muhammad Jawaid (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by GC Services Limited Partnership. (Perr, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Marziliano, August) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer GC Services Limited Partnership answer due 2/12/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/13/2020. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Answer, Plead or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by GC Services Limited Partnership. (Perr, Richard) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Muhammad Jawaid. GC Services Limited Partnership served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020. (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to GC Services Limited Partnership. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Muhammad Jawaid (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against GC Services Limited Partnership filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12134607 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Muhammad Jawaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons) (Sanders, Craig) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less