This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 13:52:39 (UTC).

Javens v. Oliver et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Javens filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Oliver. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Orinda D. Evans. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02259

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Orinda D. Evans

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Scott Javens

Cross Defendants and Defendants

Dart Container Corporation of California

ACE American Insurance Company

Darcy A. Oliver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wayne C. J. Washington

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

191 Peachtree St. Ne,, Suite 4200

Atlanta, GA 30303

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Carrie Lynn Christie

Attorney at Rutherford & Christie, LLP

225 Peachtree Street, Suite 1750, South Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

Emily Wang

Attorney at Rutherford & Christie, LLP

225 Peachtree Street, Suite 1750, South Tower

Atlanta, GA 30303

 

Court Documents

#17

#16

15 #1

Exhibit A, C, and E

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order

#12

#11

1 #9

Answer - Central Mutual Ins. Co.

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit -G -Notice of Filing of Removal (State Court)

1 #6

Exhibit -F -Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery Responses

1 #5

Exhibit -E -Affidavit of Darcy Oliver

1 #4

Exhibit -D -Ace American Ins Secretary of State Reg

1 #3

Exhibit -C -Dart Container -Secretary of State Reg

1 #2

Exhibit -B - Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Responses

1 #1

Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Initial Disclosures by Christopher Scott Javens.(Washington, Wayne) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Initial Disclosures by ACE American Insurance Company, Dart Container Corporation of California, Darcy A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, C, and E)(Christie, Carrie) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 6/29/2020. (ah) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Dart Container Corporation of California, Darcy A. Oliver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Case Management Order)(Christie, Carrie) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne C. J. Washington on behalf of Christopher Scott Javens (Washington, Wayne) (Entered: 06/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Notice of Removal for Review, to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (eop) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 5/27/20. (eop) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACE American Insurance Company, Dart Container Corporation of California and Darcy A. Oliver identifying Corporate Parent, Chubb Limited for ACE American Insurance Company; and Corporate Parent, Atlas USA Holdings, LLC for Dart Container Corporation of California. (eop) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #6 Crossclaim by ACE American Insurance Company, Dart Container Corporation of California and Darcy A. Oliver. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand; and CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against ACE American Insurance Company, Dart Container Corporation of California and Darcy A. Oliver by Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/29/2020 to correct parties. (eop). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED ANSWER to by ACE American Insurance Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Dart Container Corporation of California. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Darcy A. Oliver. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by ACE American Insurance Company. Discovery ends on 10/26/2020. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by ACE American Insurance Company, Darcy A. Oliver and Dart Container Corporation of California. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGANDC-9739127) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit -B - Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Responses, #3 Exhibit -C -Dart Container -Secretary of State Reg, #4 Exhibit -D -Ace American Ins Secretary of State Reg, #5 Exhibit -E -Affidavit of Darcy Oliver, #6 Exhibit -F -Plaintiff's Supplemental Discovery Responses, #7 Exhibit -G -Notice of Filing of Removal (State Court), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/29/2020) (dgs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2020: #9 Answer - Central Mutual Ins. Co.) (eop). (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dart Container Corporation of California is a litigant

Latest cases where ACE American Insurance Company, a Pennsylvania corporation, and ACE Property & Casualty Insurance Co., a Pennsylvania corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARRIE LYNN CHRISTIE