This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/18/2022 at 07:03:18 (UTC).

Javaid v. Mayorkas et al

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Javaid filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Mayorkas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-03583

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aamer Javaid

Defendants

Alejandro Mayorkas

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ur M. Jaddou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hazel Grierson Marinero

Attorney at Law Offices of Hazel Marinero

99 Almaden Blvd. Suite 915

San Jose, CA 95113

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Marinero, Hazel) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/14/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/21/2022 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Duplicate entry. [err103]. Proposed Summonses all name same defendant.This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #2 Proposed Summons filed by Aamer Javaid (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/1/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Marinero, Hazel) (Filed on 6/17/2022) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17273840.). Filed by Aamer Javaid. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Marinero, Hazel) (Filed on 6/17/2022) Modified on 6/17/2022 (bw, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant