This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/29/2022 at 03:39:26 (UTC).

Jatin Chopra v. Didi Global Inc. et al

Case Summary

On July 12, 2021, Plaintiff Jatin Chopra (“Plaintiff”), individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Jeffrey Philip Campisi of Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP, filed a Finance - Securities lawsuit against DiDi Global Inc. f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc. (“DiDi” or the “Company”), Will W. Cheng (“Cheng”), Alan Y. Zhuo (“Zhuo”) (collectively with Cheng, the “Exchange Act Individual Defendants”), Jean Q. Liu (“Liu”), Stephen J. Zhu (“Zhu”), Zhiyi Chen (“Chen”), Martin Chi Ping Lau (“Lau”), Kentaro Matsui (“Matsui”), Adrian Perica (“Perica”), Daniel Yong Zhang (“Zhang”) (Defendants Cheng, Zhuo, Liu, Zhu, Chen, Lau, Matsui, Perica, and Zhang collectively, the “Individual Defendants”), Goldman Sachs (Asia) L.L.C. (“Goldman Sachs”), Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (“Morgan Stanley”), J.P. Morgan Securities LLC (“J.P. Morgan”), BofA Securities, Inc. (“BofA”), Barclays Capital Inc. (“Barclays”), China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited (“China Renaissance”), China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited (“China International”), Citigroup Global Markets Inc. (“Citigroup”), Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited (“Guotai”), HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. (“HSBC”), UBS Securities LLC (“UBS”), BOCI Asia Limited (“BOCI”), BOCOM International Securities Limited (“BOCOM”), CCB International Capital Limited (“CCB”), CLSA Limited (“CLSA”), CMB International Capital Limited (“CMB”), Futu Inc. (“Futu”), ICBC International Securities Limited (“ICBC”), Mizuho Securities USA LLC (“Mizuho”), and Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited (“Tiger Brokers”) (Defendants Goldman Sachs, Morgan Stanley, J.P. Morgan, BofA, Barclays, China

Renaissance, China International, Citigroup, Guotai, HSBC, UBS, BOCI, BOCOM, CCB, CLSA, CMB, Futu, ICBC, Mizuho, and Tiger Brokers collectively, the “Underwriter Defendants”). Plaintiff seeks damages, as well as other relief, for Defendants alleged violation of Sections 11 and 15 of the Securities Act of 1933 (the “Securities Act”) and Sections 10(b) and 20(a) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 (the “Exchange Act”) relating to a allegedly misleading registration statement. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Southern District of New York. 

Plaintiff brings this action on behalf of themselves and all others who purchased or otherwise acquired DiDi: (a) ADSs issued in connection with the Company’s IPO; and/or (b) securities between June 30, 2021 and July 2, 2021, inclusive, and who were damaged thereby (the “Class”).

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “On June 30, 2021, the Company filed its prospectus on Form 424B4 with the SEC, which forms part of the Registration Statement. As stated above in ¶ 4, in the IPO, the Company sold approximately 316,800,000 shares at a price of $14.00 per share, not including the underwriters’ option. Four ADSs represent one Class A ordinary share. The Company estimated it would receive net proceeds of approximately $4.3 billion from the Offering (or $4.98 billion if the underwriters exercised their option to purchase additional ADSs in full) after deducting the underwriting discounts, commissions and estimated offering expenses.” Plaintiff also alleged that, “The Registration Statement was negligently prepared and, as a result, contained untrue statements of material facts or omitted to state other facts necessary to make the statements made not misleading, and was not prepared in accordance with the rules and regulations governing its preparation.”

Plaintiff further alleged that, “For example, the Registration Statement acknowledged that DiDi is “subject to numerous laws and regulations that address privacy, data protection and the collection, storing, sharing, use, disclosure and protection of certain types of data in various jurisdictions . . . including the Data Security Law promulgated by the Standing Committee of the National People’s Congress of China in June 2021, which will take effect in September 2021” and purported to warn of the risks of failure to comply with regulation enacted by the PRC government in the areas of Internet Security and Privacy Protection, although these risks had already materialized and the CAC had already asked DiDi to postpone the IPO.” Plaintiff then alleged that, “On Sunday July 5, 2021, The Wall Street Journal reported that the CAC had asked the Company weeks prior to the IPO to postpone the offering because of national security concerns and to “conduct a thorough self-examination of its network security.” Subsequently, Bloomberg and other sources reported on July 6, 2021that the CAC had asked DiDi at least three months earlier to delay its because of national security concerns. On this news, the Company’s stock price fell $3.04 per share, approximately 19.6%, to close at $12.49 per share on July 6, 2021, on unusually heavy trading volume. On July 9, 2021, DiDi shares closed at $12.03 per share, a decline of over 16% from the $14 per share IPO price.”

There are four claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The claims alleged are for Violation of Section 11 of the Securities Act (Against All Defendants), Violation of Section 15 of the Securities Act (Against the Individual Defendants), Violation of Section 10(b) of The Exchange Act and Rule 10b-5 Promulgated Thereunder Against DiDi and the Exchange Act Individual Defendants, and Violation of Section 20(a) of The Exchange Act (Against the Exchange Act Individual Defendants). 

In their prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested that the Court award compensatory damages in favor of Plaintiff and the other Class members against all defendants, jointly and severally, for all damages sustained as a result of Defendants’ wrongdoing, in an amount to be proven at trial, including interest thereon; reasonable costs and expenses incurred in this action, including counsel fees and expert fees; and such other and further relief as the Court may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents. 

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05973

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis A. Kaplan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jatin Chopra

Defendants

Barclays Capital Inc.

Boci Asia Limited

Bocom International Securities Limited

BofA Securities, Inc.

CCB International Capital Limited

CLSA Limited

CMB International Capital Limited

Zhiyi Chen

Will Wei Cheng

China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited

China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited

Citigroup Global Markets Inc.

Futu Inc.

Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C.

Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited

HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.

ICBC International Securities Limited

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey Philip Campisi

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Other Attorneys

Renita Sharma

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Richard Corey Worcester

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Michael Charles Griffin

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Robert Alexander Fumerton

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

Scott D. Musoff

Attorney at Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP

One Manhattan West

New York, NY 10001-8602

 

Court Documents

#20

(#24) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. The Individual Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss by July 22, 2022; 2. By August 1, 2022, after reviewing the Individual Defendants' motions to dismiss, the parties will agree upon and jointly file a stipulation concerning omnibus briefing and a request for the enlargement of pages for consolidated opposition and reply papers with respect to all Defendants' motions dismiss. 3. Plaintiffs shall file opposition papers to all Defendants' motions to dismiss by August 22,2022;and 4. All Defendants shall file replies in further support of the motions to dismiss by October 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/22/2022., Responses due by 8/22/2022, Replies due by 10/3/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (yv) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#14

(#18) ORDER: terminating as moot (19) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (19) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (19) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (27) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (27) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (27) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (33) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (33) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot(33) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (5) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot(5) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (5) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. ORDERED as follows: The Securities Class Actions are consolidated for all purposes including, but not limited to, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial proceedings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). The docket in Case No. 1:21-CV-05807-LAK shall constitute the Master Docket for this action. Every pleading filed in the consolidated action shall bear the following caption: As set forth herein. The file m civil action no. 1:21-CV-05807-LAK shall constitute a master file for every action in the consolidated action. When the document being filed pertains to all actions, the phrase "All Actions" shall appear immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:". When a pleading applies to some, but not all, of the actions, the document shall list, immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:", the docket number for each individual action to which the document applies, along with the last name of the first-listed plaintiff in said action. Movant's choice of counsel is approved and, accordingly, The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel. This order grants Dkt. 11. The Clerk shall terminate as moot Dkts. 5, 16, 19, 27 and 33. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/12/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (ama) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

#1

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Didi Global Inc...(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#16

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#22

(#21) ORDER REGARDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. Lead Plaintiff, through Lead Counsel, shall provide to Defendants a copy of the proposed CSAC by April 25, 2022. 2. Defendants shall advise Lead Counsel by May 2, 2022 whether or not they consent to the filing of the CSAC. 3. If Defendants consent to the filing of the CSAC, Lead Plaintiff will file the CSAC within three days of Defendants' notice of consent; Defendants shall file motions to dismiss the amended complaint by May 30, 2022; Lead Plaintiff shall file oppositions to the motions to dismiss by June 30, 2022; and Defendants shall file replies in further support of the motions to dismiss July 30, 2022. 4. If Defendants do not consent to the filing of the CSAC, Lead Plaintiff shall file a motion for leave to amend the CAC by May 9, 2022. 5. If Lead Plaintiff files a motion for leave to amend the CAC on May 9, 2022, then Defendants shall file any opposition briefs no later than May 23, 2022, and Lead Plaintiff shall file any reply briefs no later than June 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 5/30/2022. Responses due by 6/30/2022 Replies due by 7/30/2022. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/27/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (mml) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#16

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE SERVED UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE TO DISMISS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. No Served Underwriter Defendants shall have any obligation to respond to the July 6, 2021 Espinal complaint with which they were served. 2. If any of the Served Underwriter Defendants are named as defendants in the Consolidated Amended Complaint to be filed on January 7, 2022, those Served Underwriters shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint by March 8, 2022. 3. If the Served Underwriter Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion on or before May 9, 2022, and the Served Underwriter Defendants shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before June 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022., Responses due by 5/9/2022, Replies due by 6/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/15/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (yv) Modified on 11/17/2021 (yv). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#15

(#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended consolidated complaint (the Amended Complaint") on or before January 7, 2022. 2. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Lead Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by March 8, 2022. 3. If Defendant moves to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion on or before May 9, 2022, and Defendant shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before June 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022, Responses due by 5/9/2022, Replies due by 6/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/22/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (ate) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

10 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS THE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. The Individual Defendants shall file their motions to dismiss by July 22, 2022; 2. By August 1, 2022, after reviewing the Individual Defendants' motions to dismiss, the parties will agree upon and jointly file a stipulation concerning omnibus briefing and a request for the enlargement of pages for consolidated opposition and reply papers with respect to all Defendants' motions dismiss. 3. Plaintiffs shall file opposition papers to all Defendants' motions to dismiss by August 22,2022;and 4. All Defendants shall file replies in further support of the motions to dismiss by October 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 7/22/2022., Responses due by 8/22/2022, Replies due by 10/3/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 6/27/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (yv) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#23) ORDER denying as moot (95) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-cv-05807-LAK (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#22) ORDER denying as moot (92) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-cv-05807-LAK (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan)(Text Only Order) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (Kaplan, Lewis) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (sac) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER REGARDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTIONS TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. Lead Plaintiff, through Lead Counsel, shall provide to Defendants a copy of the proposed CSAC by April 25, 2022. 2. Defendants shall advise Lead Counsel by May 2, 2022 whether or not they consent to the filing of the CSAC. 3. If Defendants consent to the filing of the CSAC, Lead Plaintiff will file the CSAC within three days of Defendants' notice of consent; Defendants shall file motions to dismiss the amended complaint by May 30, 2022; Lead Plaintiff shall file oppositions to the motions to dismiss by June 30, 2022; and Defendants shall file replies in further support of the motions to dismiss July 30, 2022. 4. If Defendants do not consent to the filing of the CSAC, Lead Plaintiff shall file a motion for leave to amend the CAC by May 9, 2022. 5. If Lead Plaintiff files a motion for leave to amend the CAC on May 9, 2022, then Defendants shall file any opposition briefs no later than May 23, 2022, and Lead Plaintiff shall file any reply briefs no later than June 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 5/30/2022. Responses due by 6/30/2022 Replies due by 7/30/2022. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 4/27/2022) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (mml) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE SERVED UNDERWRITER DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER OR MOVE TO DISMISS, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. No Served Underwriter Defendants shall have any obligation to respond to the July 6, 2021 Espinal complaint with which they were served. 2. If any of the Served Underwriter Defendants are named as defendants in the Consolidated Amended Complaint to be filed on January 7, 2022, those Served Underwriters shall answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint by March 8, 2022. 3. If the Served Underwriter Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion on or before May 9, 2022, and the Served Underwriter Defendants shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before June 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022., Responses due by 5/9/2022, Replies due by 6/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/15/21) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (yv) Modified on 11/17/2021 (yv). (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING TIME TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MOTION TO DISMISS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to the Court's approval: 1. Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended consolidated complaint (the Amended Complaint") on or before January 7, 2022. 2. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Lead Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by March 8, 2022. 3. If Defendant moves to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall file any opposition to such motion on or before May 9, 2022, and Defendant shall file any reply in support of such motion on or before June 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2022, Responses due by 5/9/2022, Replies due by 6/23/2022.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/22/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (ate) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER: terminating as moot (19) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (19) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (19) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (27) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (27) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (27) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (33) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot (33) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot(33) Motion to Appoint Counsel; terminating as moot (5) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; terminating as moot(5) Motion to Appoint; terminating as moot (5) Motion to Appoint Counsel in case 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. ORDERED as follows: The Securities Class Actions are consolidated for all purposes including, but not limited to, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial proceedings pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a). The docket in Case No. 1:21-CV-05807-LAK shall constitute the Master Docket for this action. Every pleading filed in the consolidated action shall bear the following caption: As set forth herein. The file m civil action no. 1:21-CV-05807-LAK shall constitute a master file for every action in the consolidated action. When the document being filed pertains to all actions, the phrase "All Actions" shall appear immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:". When a pleading applies to some, but not all, of the actions, the document shall list, immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:", the docket number for each individual action to which the document applies, along with the last name of the first-listed plaintiff in said action. Movant's choice of counsel is approved and, accordingly, The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel. This order grants Dkt. 11. The Clerk shall terminate as moot Dkts. 5, 16, 19, 27 and 33. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 10/12/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-05807-LAK, 1:21-cv-05973-LAK, 1:21-cv-06603-LAK, 1:21-cv-07550-LAK (ama) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-05807-LAK.. (ama) (Entered: 10/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Charles Griffin on behalf of Didi Global Inc...(Griffin, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jatin Chopra; Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; party name was modified to add alias separately. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the related case statement was not properly signed by the attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer - enter the related case number when prompted - and attach the correct PDF. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Philip Campisi to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF case caption must list all of the parties. If all of the party names do not fit, include 'et al';. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-05807-LAK. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/13/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc.,Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, Zhiyi Chen, Will Wei Cheng, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Adria Perica, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Daniel Yong Zhang, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, and Alan Yue Zhuo, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Campisi, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/13/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Adria Perica, Alan Yue Zhuo, Barclays Capital Inc., Boci Asia Limited, Bocom International Securities Limited, BofA Securities, Inc., CCB International Capital Limited, CLSA Limited, CMB International Capital Limited, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, China Renaissance Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Daniel Yong Zhang, Didi Global Inc.f/k/a Xiaoju Kuaizhi Inc., Futu Inc., Goldman Sachs (ASIA) L.L.C., Guotai Junan Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., ICBC International Securities Limited, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jean Qing Liu, Kentaro Matsui, Martin Chi Ping Lau, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Stephen Jingshi Zhu, Tiger Brokers (NZ) Limited, UBS Securities LLC, Will Wei Cheng, Zhiyi Chen. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24782982)Document filed by Jatin Chopra..(Campisi, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Futu Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CLSA Limited is a litigant