This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2021 at 10:39:53 (UTC).

Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc. v. Scottsdale Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nina Y. Wang and R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02034

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Nina Y. Wang

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc.

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David Martin Roth

Attorney at Roth Milne

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 416

Denver, CO 80246

Jennifer A. Milne

Attorney at Roth Milne

950 South Cherry Street, Suite 416

Denver, CO 80246

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Keith Lavin

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Christine Marie Kroupa

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

John M. Palmeri

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

20 #1

redlined version

20 #20

Main Document

#19

(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc.. (Roth, David) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/10/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02034-RBJ. (trvo, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

#15

(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#13

(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Consent Form due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/15/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/22/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#5

(#14) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

1 #8

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

State Court Return of Service on Scottsdale

1 #5

State Court Summons

1 #4

State Court Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #3

State Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B to Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit A to Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Scottsdale Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021-CV-32401. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7979509), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 State Court Summons, #6 State Court Return of Service on Scottsdale, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/31/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2022. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/16/21. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, ) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc.. (Roth, David) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • Docket(#18) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 9/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is vacated. The Court requests that the parties confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 9/15/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. Without holding a Scheduling Conference, the Court will review and enter the order making such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. If the parties prefer that the Court hold a Scheduling Conference, please notify Chambers via email by the date the proposed scheduling order is due and Court staff will provide you a date. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/10/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/10/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02034-RBJ. (trvo, ) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #15 Consent/Non-Consent Form to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to JudgeLewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-02034-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (alave, ) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #5 Complaint and Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Company.(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 08/13/2021. Consent Form due by 9/8/2021. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/15/2021. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/22/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (alave, ) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint filed by Plaintiff and by Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company. Scottsdale Insurance Company answer due 8/24/2021. (Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John M. Palmeri on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance CompanyAttorney John M. Palmeri added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Palmeri, John) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer A. Milne on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Jennifer A. Milne added to party Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc.(pty:pla) (Milne, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David Martin Roth on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David Martin Roth added to party Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc.(pty:pla) (Roth, David) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon Scottsdale Insurance Company on 7/6/2021 (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Scottsdale Insurance Company, filed by Jason Street Condominium Association, Inc..(cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Keith Lavin on behalf of Scottsdale Insurance CompanyAttorney Andrew Keith Lavin added to party Scottsdale Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Lavin, Andrew) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Scottsdale Insurance Company from Denver District Court, Case Number 2021-CV-32401. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7979509), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Complaint and Jury Demand, #5 State Court Summons, #6 State Court Return of Service on Scottsdale, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Kroupa, Christine) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less