This case was last updated from PACER on 05/18/2021 at 08:53:59 (UTC).

Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A. et al v. Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/19/2021 Jason R Bailey, MD, P A filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gray H Miller and Christina A Bryan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00917

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gray H Miller

Referral Judge

Christina A Bryan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A.

Lone Star Surgical Partners, P.A.

Defendants

Tideland Signal Corporation

Enterprise Products Partners L.P.

TechnipFMC USA, Inc.

McCurdy Services, Inc.

Redstone Group, Ltd.

H-E-B, LP

Enterprise Products Operating, LLC

FMC Technologies, Inc.

Key Energy Services, Inc.

Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc

Johnston Water Utility LLC

The WellBoss Company, LLC doing business as Downhole Technology

National Oilwell Varco, L.P.

Winther Investment, Inc.

Xylem, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Noah Morrie Horwitz

Attorney at Roberts Markland LLP

2555 N. Macgregor Way

Houston, TX 77004

David M. Estes

Attorney at Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman LLC

103 Eisenhower Parkway, Second Floor

Roseland, NJ 07068

Eric D Katz

Attorney at Mazie Slater Katz & Freeman, LLC

103 Eisenhower Parkway, Second Floor

Roseland, NJ 07068

Sean Alan Roberts

Attorney at Roberts Markland LLP

2555 N Macgregor

Houston, TX 77004

Defendant Attorneys

Claudia L Cortes

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 South Wacker Dr, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Martin James Bishop

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

10 S. Wacker Drive, 40Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60606

Scott Tyler Williams

Attorney at Reed Smith

2850 N. Harwood Street, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Valerie B Mullican

Attorney at Hunton Andrews et al

600 Travis St, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

John Bruce Shely

Attorney at Andrews Kurth et al

600 Travis, Ste 4200

Houston, TX 77002

Mark J Levine

Attorney at Weycer, Kaplan, Pulaski Y Zuber P.C.

24 Greenway Plaza, Ste 2050

Houston, TX 77046

 

Court Documents

#37

(#37) RESPONSE to #35 Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge , filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc, Enterprise Products Partners L.P., H-E-B, LP, Johnston Water Utility LLC, Key Energy Services, Inc., McCurdy Services, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, L.P., Redstone Group, Ltd., TechnipFMC USA, Inc., The WellBoss Company, LLC, Tideland Signal Corporation, Winther Investment, Inc.. (Williams, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#36

(#36) NOTICE Plaintiff's Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Horwitz, Noah) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#35

(#35) ORDER - CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

34 #1

Exhibit Dkt. No. 5

#34

(#34) RESPONSE to #33 Notice (Other) re: Letter to Judge Miller, filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. No. 5)(Williams, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#33

(#33) NOTICE Letter to Court Regarding Second Removal and Previous Recusals by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Roberts, Sean) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles Eskridge recused. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

#31

(#31) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Eskridge. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#30

(#30) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

1 #69

Exhibit FFF

1 #53

Exhibit PP

1 #52

Exhibit OO

1 #6

Exhibit A, Part 4

1 #5

Exhibit A, Part 3

1 #4

Exhibit A, Part 2

1 #3

Exhibit A, Part 1

1 #2

Exhibit Index of Matters

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) RESPONSE to #35 Order, Case Referred to Magistrate Judge , filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc, Enterprise Products Partners L.P., H-E-B, LP, Johnston Water Utility LLC, Key Energy Services, Inc., McCurdy Services, Inc., National Oilwell Varco, L.P., Redstone Group, Ltd., TechnipFMC USA, Inc., The WellBoss Company, LLC, Tideland Signal Corporation, Winther Investment, Inc.. (Williams, Scott) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) NOTICE Plaintiff's Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Horwitz, Noah) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER - CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan. (Signed by Judge Gray H Miller) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) RESPONSE to #33 Notice (Other) re: Letter to Judge Miller, filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dkt. No. 5)(Williams, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE Letter to Court Regarding Second Removal and Previous Recusals by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Roberts, Sean) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Charles Eskridge recused. Case reassigned to Judge Gray H Miller for all further proceedings.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4) (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Charles Eskridge. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Ewing Werlein, Jr. Judge David Hittner no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (olindor, 4) (Entered: 04/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Claudia L. Cortes to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Eric D. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for David M. Estes to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2021. (Horwitz, Noah) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Eric D. Katz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/19/2021. (Horwitz, Noah) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Sean A. Roberts on behalf of Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Roberts, Sean) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Noah M. Horwitz on behalf of Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Horwitz, Noah) (Entered: 03/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RESPONSE to #3 Notice (Other) re S. Williams Letter to U.S. District Judge Hittner and U.S. Magistrate Judge Bray, filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc. (Williams, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc, filed.(Williams, Scott) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Letter to Court Regarding Second Removal in this Case by Jason R. Bailey, MD, P.A., filed. (Roberts, Sean) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(DesireeSillasadi, 4) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th Judicial District Court, Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-16707 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26140663) filed by Blue Cross & Blue Shield of Texas Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Matters, #3 Exhibit A, Part 1, #4 Exhibit A, Part 2, #5 Exhibit A, Part 3, #6 Exhibit A, Part 4, #7 Exhibit A, Part 5, #8 Exhibit A, Part 6, #9 Exhibit B, Part 1, #10 Exhibit B, Part 2, #11 Exhibit B, Part 3, #12 Exhibit B, Part 4, #13 Exhibit B, Part 5, #14 Exhibit C, #15 Exhibit D, #16 Exhibit E, #17 Exhibit F, #18 Exhibit G, #19 Exhibit H, #20 Exhibit I, #21 Exhibit J, #22 Exhibit K, #23 Exhibit L, #24 Exhibit M, #25 Exhibit N, #26 Exhibit O, #27 Exhibit P, #28 Exhibit Q, #29 Exhibit R, #30 Exhibit S, #31 Exhibit T, #32 Exhibit U, #33 Exhibit V, #34 Exhibit W, #35 Exhibit X, #36 Exhibit Y, #37 Exhibit Z, #38 Exhibit AA, #39 Exhibit BB, #40 Exhibit CC, #41 Exhibit DD, #42 Exhibit EE, #43 Exhibit FF, #44 Exhibit GG, #45 Exhibit HH, #46 Exhibit II, #47 Exhibit JJ, #48 Exhibit KK, #49 Exhibit LL, #50 Exhibit MM, #51 Exhibit NN, #52 Exhibit OO, #53 Exhibit PP, #54 Exhibit QQ, #55 Exhibit RR, #56 Exhibit SS, #57 Exhibit TT, #58 Exhibit UU, #59 Exhibit VV, #60 Exhibit WW, #61 Exhibit XX, #62 Exhibit YY, #63 Exhibit ZZ, #64 Exhibit AAA, #65 Exhibit BBB, #66 Exhibit CCC, #67 Exhibit DDD, #68 Exhibit EEE, #69 Exhibit FFF, #70 Exhibit GGG, #71 Exhibit HHH, #72 Exhibit III, #73 Exhibit JJJ, #74 Exhibit KKK, #75 Exhibit LLL)(Williams, Scott) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Winther Investment, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TechnipFMC USA, Inc. is a litigant