This case was last updated from PACER on 11/30/2019 at 05:04:18 (UTC).

Jarboe v. Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2019 Jarboe filed an Other - False Claims Act lawsuit against Cherry Creek Mortgage Co , Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Kristen L. Mix. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01529

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - False Claims Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Kristen L. Mix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Thomas R. Jarboe

Defendants

Stacey L. Harding

Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc.

Jeffrey S May

Interested Party

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Plaintiff Attorneys

Melvin N.A. Avanzado

Attorney at Avanzado Law Firm APLC

215 North Marengo Avenue, Third Floor

Pasadena, CA 91101

Paul F. Kirsch

Attorney at Paul F. Kirsch, Inc, Law Offices of .

1970 Broadway, Suite 700

Oakland, CA 94707

Kevin Thomas Traskos

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Jasand Patric Mock

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office-Denver

1801 California Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Stephen Caravajal, Jr.

Attorney at Murr Siler & Accomazzo, P.C.

410 17Th Street, Suite 2400

Denver, CO 80202

Corinne Christine Miller

Attorney at Childs McCune LLC

821 17Th Street, Suite 500

Denver, CO 80202

Daniel R. Delaney

Attorney at Murr Siler & Accomazzo, P.C.

410 17Th Street, Suite 2400

Denver, CO 80202

Jason Wayne McElroy

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 19Th Street, N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

Michael Y. Kieval

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 19Th Street, N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

Mitchel H. Kider

Attorney at Weiner Brodsky Kider PC

1300 19Th Street, N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#106

(#106) MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#105

(#105) REPLY to Response to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

#104

(#104) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#103

(#103) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19 GRANTING #101 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order (#101-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

101 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order

#101

(#101) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(McElroy, Jason) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#100

(#100) RESPONSE to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (McElroy, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#98

(#98) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION to Dismiss the FCA Claims by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

#94

(#100) RESPONSE to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (McElroy, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#8

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May.Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#106) MOTION to Stay PROCEEDINGS PENDING DECISION ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE CASES by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#105) REPLY to Response to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 11/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#104) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/21/19 GRANTING #101 Parties' Joint Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Protective Order (#101-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. (nmarb, ) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) MEMORANDUM regarding #101 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/20/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Stipulated Protective Order)(McElroy, Jason) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) RESPONSE to #94 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S May. (McElroy, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ORDER granting #98 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply on Motion to Dismiss. Having reviewed the Motion, and for good cause shown, it is ORDERED that, on or before 12/09/2019, Plaintiff shall file his Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 95), and on or before 1/06/2020, Defendants shall file their reply to Plaintiff's Response. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/04/2019. Text Only Entry (cmalc3) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 MOTION to Dismiss the FCA Claims by Plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Avanzado, Melvin) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/23/19. (lgale, ) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) UNSEALED NOTICE OF ELECTION BY THE UNITED STATES TO DECLINE INTERVENTION AND STIPULATION RE PARTIAL UNSEALING OF CASE. (iv) Modified on 12/20/2018 Per Order #11 (iv). [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SEALED DOCUMENT- ORDER EXTENDING SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SEALED DOCUMENT- MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD; DECLARATION OF DONALD W. YOO IN SUPPORT THEREOF. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SEALED DOCUMENT- STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF SEAL AND GOVERNMENT'S ELECTION PERIOD. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge George H. Wu, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-2305 GW (AGRx) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 05/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against defendants Cherry Creek Mortgage Co., Inc., Stacey L. Harding, Jeffrey S. May.Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.(Filing fee $ 400) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Thomas R. Jarboe. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 5/29/2019.] (Entered: 04/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHERRY CREEK MORTGAGE CO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paul F. Kirsch(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melvin N A Avanzado