This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2020 at 05:51:04 (UTC).

Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation v. Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd.

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Janzen Janzen Chiropractic Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00263

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation

Defendant

Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer Lee Taylor

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Juliana Ilyssa Finley

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit B

#3

(#3) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

7 #1

copy of complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment, Order To Register Trademark, Order To Cancel Trademark Registrations; Trial By Jury Demand against Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14065327). Filed by Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

#7

(#7) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #(1) copy of complaint) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding trademark infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: #(1) copy of complaint) (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/9/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment, Order To Register Trademark, Order To Cancel Trademark Registrations; Trial By Jury Demand against Scoliosis Clinics Australia Pty Ltd., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-14065327). Filed by Janzen & Janzen Chiropractic Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.