This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2020 at 09:26:03 (UTC).

January v. El Paso County

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 January filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against El Paso County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gordon P. Gallagher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02791

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon P. Gallagher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Macyo Joelle January

Buena Vista, CO 81211

Defendant

Lengerich

Respondent

El Paso County

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/27/2020, re: #5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. filed by Macyo Joelle January. ORDERED the Applicant is directed to cure the remaining deficiencies as noted above within thirty days of the date of this Minute Order. Failure to comply with a Court order within the time allowed may result in the dismissal of an action. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Macyo Joelle January. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, filed by Macyo Joelle January.(sphil, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Motion for Extension for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ECF No. 1, is DENIED as moot as a 28 U.S.C. 2254 action has been initiated, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/15/2020.(sphil, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Order for Extension for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Macyo Joelle January. (alave, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/27/2020, re: #5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. filed by Macyo Joelle January. ORDERED the Applicant is directed to cure the remaining deficiencies as noted above within thirty days of the date of this Minute Order. Failure to comply with a Court order within the time allowed may result in the dismissal of an action. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Petitioner Macyo Joelle January. (sphil, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 2241, filed by Macyo Joelle January.(sphil, ) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. ORDERED that the Motion for Extension for Writ of Habeas Corpus, ECF No. 1, is DENIED as moot as a 28 U.S.C. 2254 action has been initiated, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 9/15/2020.(sphil, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Order for Extension for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Macyo Joelle January. (alave, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less