This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:03 (UTC).

Jane Matsuba-Garcia v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Jane Matsuba-Garcia filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is R. Gary Klausner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10323

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jane Matsuba-Garcia

Dublin, CA 94568

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

David Bybee

Attorney at US Department of Justice

1400 New York Avenue 3Rd Floor

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PETITIONERS MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2255 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. ORDERS the government to respond to said motion no later than January 15, 2020. The Court FURTHER ORDERS petitioners reply to be filed and served no later than February 14, 2020. (et) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST for Extension to Answer an Opposition and Appointed CJA Counsel filed by plaintiff Jane Matsuba-Garcia. (jp) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:16-cr-538-RGK-3, filed by petitioner Jane Matsuba-Garcia. (ghap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Bybee on behalf of Respondent United States of America (Attorney David Bybee added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Bybee, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#5

(#5) OPPOSITION to Defendant's 2255 Motion filed by Respondent United States of America. (Bybee, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST for Extension to Answer an Opposition and Appointed CJA Counsel filed by plaintiff Jane Matsuba-Garcia. (jp) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OPPOSITION to Defendant's 2255 Motion filed by Respondent United States of America. (Bybee, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David Bybee on behalf of Respondent United States of America (Attorney David Bybee added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Bybee, David) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PETITIONERS MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR CORRECT SENTENCE BY A PERSON IN FEDERAL CUSTODY PURSUANT TO 28 USC 2255 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. ORDERS the government to respond to said motion no later than January 15, 2020. The Court FURTHER ORDERS petitioners reply to be filed and served no later than February 14, 2020. (et) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (ghap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge R. Gary Klausner. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:16-cr-538-RGK-3, filed by petitioner Jane Matsuba-Garcia. (ghap) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.