This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/21/2021 at 12:20:37 (UTC).

Jane Doe v. Reddit, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/22/2021 Jane Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Reddit, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and Karen E. Scott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00768

  • Filing Date:

    04/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

Karen E. Scott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendant

Reddit, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davida P. Brook

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Krysta Kauble Pachman

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steve M. Cohen

Attorney at Pollock Cohen LLP

60 Broad Street 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Arun Subramanian

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin A Linsley

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

555 Mission Street Suite 3000

San Francisco, CA 94105-0921

Theano Evangelis Kapur

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Michael H Dore

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/19/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge James V. Selna. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A (challenged pleading)) (Kapur, Theano) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Order Setting Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference for 7/19/2021 at 10:00 am before Judge James V. Selna. Counsel shall file the Joint Rule 26 Meeting Report, with the completed Exhibit A, by 7/12/2021. (lb) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR REDDIT, INC. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT #21 , by Judge James V. Selna. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The deadline for Reddit to respond to the Complaint shall be June 16, 2021. (es) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Reddit, Inc. answer now due 6/16/2021, filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kapur, Theano) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Kapur, Theano) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Reddit, Inc., (Kapur, Theano) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael H Dore on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Michael H Dore added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Dore, Michael) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kristin A Linsley on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Kristin A Linsley added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Linsley, Kristin) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur on behalf of Defendant Reddit, Inc. (Attorney Theano Evangelis Kapur added to party Reddit, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kapur, Theano) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant Reddit, Inc. served on 4/26/2021, answer due 5/17/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lai Saevang, CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA (lb) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve Cohen. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Reddit, Inc. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (esa) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31169070 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REDDIT INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theane Evangelis Kapur

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristin Andrea Linsley Esq.