This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2021 at 11:56:56 (UTC).

Jane Doe v. MindGeek USA Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 Jane Doe filed an Other lawsuit against MindGeek USA Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00338

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants

MG Content RT Limited

MindGeek USA Incorporated

MG Freesites II, Ltd

9219-1568 Quebec, Inc. doing business as MindGeek

MindGeek S.A.R.L.

MG Freesites, Ltd doing business as Pornhub

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Davida P. Brook

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Krysta Kauble Pachman

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steve M. Cohen

Attorney at Pollock Cohen LLP

60 Broad Street 24Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Arun Subramanian

Attorney at Susman Godfrey LLP

1301 Avenue Of The Americas 32Nd Floor

New York, NY 10019-6023

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Parties, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe.(Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) 21 DAY ALIAS Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Content RT Limited, MG Freesites II, Ltd, MG Freesites, Ltd, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (twdb) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Steve Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe, designating Krysta Pachman as local counsel #13 . (iv) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe, designating Krysta Pachman as local counsel #11 . (iv) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, upon Defendant MindGeek USA Incorporated served on 2/26/2021, answer due 3/19/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum, Registered Agent, CT Corporation Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30641312) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Outdated version of the form used. (sbou) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants 9219-1568 Quebec, Inc., MG Content RT Limited, MG Freesites II, Ltd, MG Freesites, Ltd, MindGeek S.A.R.L., MindGeek USA Incorporated. (twdb) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steve M. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Jane Doe (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-30669863) filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steve Cohen on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Arun Subramanian on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (et) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (et) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions or Proceedings filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe, (Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30622807 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Jane Doe(pty:pla))(Kauble Pachman, Krysta) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MG Freesites II LTD is a litigant

Latest cases where 9277-3068 Quebec Incorporated a Canadian Corporation doing business as Ranch Brand Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krysta Kauble Pachman