This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 08:57:53 (UTC).

JANE DOE JJ v. USA GYMNASTICS

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 JANE DOE JJ filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against USA GYMNASTICS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Tim A. Baker and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02507

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Appellant

JANE DOE JJ

Appellee

USA GYMNASTICS

Interested Party

TORT CLAIMANTS COMMITTEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

John J. Allman

Attorney at HESTER BAKER KREBS LLC

One Indiana Square, 211 N. Pennsylvania Street

Indinanapolis, IN 46204-1816

Andrew S. Buzin

Attorney at BUZIN LAW, P.C.

111 Broadway, Suite 1204

New York, NY 10006

Appellee Attorneys

Mark D. Stuaan

Attorney at BARNES & THORNBURG, LLP (Indianapolis)

11 South Meridian Street

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Melissa Megan Root

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

George M. Plews

Attorney at PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP

1346 North Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46202

John Thomas Piggins

Attorney at MILLER JOHNSON

45 Ottawa Ave, Sw Ste 1100, Po Box 306

Grand Rapids, MI 49501

Gregory M. Gotwald

Attorney at PLEWS SHADLEY RACHER & BRAUN LLP

1346 North Delaware Street

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Catherine L. Steege

Attorney at JENNER & BLOCK LLP

353 N. Clark Street

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

Interested Party Attorneys

Steven W. Golden

Attorney at IPachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Ave, Ste 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Ilan D. Scharf

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

780 Third Ave, Ste 34Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Deborah J. Caruso

Attorney at RUBIN & LEVIN, P.C.

135 North Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Meredith R. Theisen

Attorney at RUBIN & LEVIN, P.C.

135 North Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Kenneth H. Brown

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

150 California St, 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

James I. Stang

Attorney at Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP

150 California St, 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#4

#5

5 #1

Part 2

5 #2

Part 3

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

#8

#9

9 #1

Appendix Volume I

9 #2

Appendix Volume II

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support of Appeal, filed by Appellant JANE DOE JJ. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Volume I, #2 Appendix Volume II)(Buzin, Andrew) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Supplemental Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re: Bankruptcy Document #1218 (BRB) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Submission of Exhibits A, A and B to Transcript of Bankruptcy Court Hearing held on 8/26/2020 before Judge Robyn L. Moberly (NAR) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) TRANSCRIPT of Bankruptcy Court hearing held on 8/26/2020 before Judge Robyn L. Moberly. (50 pages.) For information on obtaining copies, please contact the U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk's Office (Telephone: (317) 229-3800) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/30/2020. (NAR) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3)(NAR) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Buzin on behalf of Appellant JANE DOE JJ. (Buzin, Andrew) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket(#3) ***PLEASE DISERGARD DOCKETED IN ERROR** Notice to District Court: Notice of Incomplete Filing issued to Appellant for failure to pay the filing fee. (NAR) Modified on 9/30/2020 (JRB). (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice to Parties of Briefing Schedule in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Bankruptcy Rules of Procedure. (JRB) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-9108-RLM-11. File received, filed by JANE DOE JJ.(NAR) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA Gymnastics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Scott Buzin