This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/08/2022 at 09:03:00 (UTC).

Jane Balmes v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Jane Balmes filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and James C. Mahan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01759

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary Jane Balmes

Defendants

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Capital One Services, LLC

National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.

AT&T Mobility LLC

Cox Communications, Inc.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Haines

Attorney at Freedom Law Firm

8985 S. Eastern Avenuesuite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Gerardo Avalos

Attorney at Freedom Law Firm

8985 S Eastern Ave, Suite 350

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Michael Kind

Attorney at Kind Law

8860 S. Maryland Parkwaysuite 106

Las Vegas, NV 89123

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Bradwell Gordon

Attorney at Naylor & Braster Attorneys at Law, PLLC

1050 Indigo Dr.Ste. 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Jennifer L Braster

Attorney at Naylor & Braster

1050 Indigo Drive, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89145

Katherine A. Neben

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Jeremy J. Thompson

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP

100 S. 5Th St.,Suite 1900

Minneapolis, NV 89169

Gia Marina

Attorney at Clark Hill

3800 Howard Hughes Parkwaysuite 500

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Robert E Schumacher

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

300 South 4Th Street, Suite 1550

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Jacob G. Clark

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

300 S. Fourth St.Suite 1550

Las Vegas, NV 89101

Michael N Feder

Attorney at Dickinson Wright PLLC

3883 Howard Hughes Parkwaysuite 800

Las Vegas, NV 89169

 

Court Documents

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Settlement with Experian by Mary Jane Balmes. (Haines, George) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#39

(#39) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#38

(#38) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc..(Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#37

(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gia Marina on behalf of Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#36

(#36) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#35

(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#34

(#34) ORDER Granting #33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gia Marina for Equifax Information Services LLC substituted in place of Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/7/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#33

(#33) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Gia Marina in for Attorney Jeremy Thompson by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#32

(#32) ORDER Granting #31 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List as to Attorney Michael Feder for Defendant Cox Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/6/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

#3

#2

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Summons

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Settlement with Experian by Mary Jane Balmes. (Haines, George) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc..(Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gia Marina on behalf of Defendant National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc.. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equifax Information Services LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC added. (Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Marina, Gia) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER Granting #33 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gia Marina for Equifax Information Services LLC substituted in place of Attorney Jeremy J. Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/7/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Gia Marina in for Attorney Jeremy Thompson by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Thompson, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) ORDER Granting #31 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List as to Attorney Michael Feder for Defendant Cox Communications, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/6/2021.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ABG) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MOTION to remove attorney Michael N. Feder from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant Cox Communications, Inc.. (Feder, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Balmes re #3 Summons Issued. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 10/4/2021. (Haines, George) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Balmes re #3 Summons Issued. AT&T Mobility LLC served on 10/4/2021. (Haines, George) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Balmes re #3 Summons Issued. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 9/30/2021. (Haines, George) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Jane Balmes re #3 Summons Issued. Cox Communications, Inc. served on 10/4/2021. (Haines, George) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Stipulation Re: #1 Complaint. Cox Communications, Inc. answer due 11/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) For Cox Communications Inc.to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Cox Communications, Inc.. (Feder, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility LLC, Capital One Services, LLC, Cox Communications, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. (DRS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mary Jane Balmes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kind, Michael) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6641792) by Mary Jane Balmes. Proof of service due by 12/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kind, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Consumer Telecom & Utilities Exchange, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Capital One Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where COX COMMUNICATIONS is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant