This case was last updated from PACER on 03/19/2019 at 07:32:25 (UTC).

Janan v. Trump et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2019 Janan filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Trump. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Karen B. Molzen, Kirtan Khalsa and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Karen B. Molzen

Presiding Judges

Kirtan Khalsa

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anne Janan

Albuquerque, NM 87114

Defendants

The U.S. Electoral College

Donald Trump

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed The U.S. Electoral College served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The U.S. Electoral College, Donald Trump, filed by Anne Janan. (jg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/18/2019) (jg). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Anne Janan. (gr) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#13

(#13) Letter by Anne Janan. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF ABSENCE by Anne Janan from February 25 through April 25. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#17

(#17) FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (gr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#12

(#12) Letter by Anne Janan requesting the court to lodge a disk containing "Order One" and "Order Two". (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#16

(#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT #10 MOTION to Dismiss; and DENYING AS MOOT #9 MOTION to Dismiss. See Order for Specifics. (gr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Spouse, Gary Henderson. (mnb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Anne Janan. (ln) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#10

(#10) SECOND MOTION to Dismiss by Anne Janan. (jg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#3

(#3) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Anne Janan (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald Trump served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (jg) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) FINAL JUDGMENT by District Judge Martha Vazquez. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. (gr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by District Judge Martha Vazquez DENYING #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint; DENYING AS MOOT #10 MOTION to Dismiss; and DENYING AS MOOT #9 MOTION to Dismiss. See Order for Specifics. (gr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed The U.S. Electoral College served on 1/30/2019, answer due 2/20/2019. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE OF ABSENCE by Anne Janan from February 25 through April 25. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Letter by Anne Janan. (gr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Letter by Anne Janan requesting the court to lodge a disk containing "Order One" and "Order Two". (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed Donald Trump served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/19/2019. (jg) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SECOND MOTION to Dismiss by Anne Janan. (jg) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by Anne Janan. (gr) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen by District Judge Martha Vazquez. (gr) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend #1 Complaint by Anne Janan. (ln) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Plaintiff's Spouse, Gary Henderson. (mnb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • (#5) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to United States District Judge Martha Vazquez as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Summons Issued as to The U.S. Electoral College, Donald Trump. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen assigned. (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CM/ECF Pro Se Notification Form by Anne Janan (jg) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The U.S. Electoral College, Donald Trump, filed by Anne Janan. (jg) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/18/2019) (jg). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • (#2) Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number ALB042439 (mnb)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] Modified Document # on 1/18/2019 (jg). (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.