This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:26:15 (UTC).

Jamison v. Smith

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Jamison filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Smith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-02834

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Rickey Jamison

Chillocothe, OH 45601

Respondent

Annette Chambers Smith

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Rickey Jamison. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Rickey Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketLAST NOTICE: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. In order to complete our final transition to NextGen, CM/ECF will be offline starting at 12:00 noon on Friday, February 7, 2020, through 11:59 p.m. Sunday, February 9, 2020. Pursuant to General Order 2020-02, we have established an email box, nextgenfilings@ohnd.uscourts.gov, for submitting documents to be filed during this period.Preparing for NextGen is a two-step process. Step one was to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Each attorney should have their own individual upgraded PACER account at this time. Step two will be to link your upgraded PACER account to your OHND e-filing account in the NextGen CM/ECF system on or after February 10, 2020. # Linking Instructions. You will be unable to e-file until the accounts are linked. If you have any additional questions, please call the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketIMPORTANT: Prepare now and avoid delays logging in later. The U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Ohio [OHND] will be upgrading CM/ECF to the Next Generation of CM/ECF [NextGen] on February 10, 2020. Information regarding NextGen can be found # on the court's website.Preparing for NextGen CM/ECF is a multi-step process. Step one is to obtain or upgrade your PACER account. Currently, attorneys within a firm may share a PACER account. This will not be allowed with NextGen. Each attorney must have their own upgraded PACER account. If you are using a shared PACER account, register for a new PACER account by clicking # here.If you have an upgraded PACER account for another NextGen court or your PACER account was created after August 10, 2014, no further action is required at this time. If neither applies, you must upgrade your legacy PACER account. If this is not done, you will be unable to e-file after February 10, 2020. Instructions for linking your PACER account to your CM/ECF account will be sent in February. If you still have questions, please contact the PACER Service Center at 800-676-6854 or the Clerk's Office Help Desk at 1-800-355-8498. (SL) (ADI) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketFiling Fee in the amount of $5.00 received from Ricky Jamison. Receipt # 14660119664. (B,R) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRemark by Clerk: This case was assigned and processed without the filing of the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet, which is required by Local Rule 3.13(a)., Copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254), #3 Administrative Track DCM Initial Order mailed to Ricky Jamison and second page of Civil Cover Sheet at P.O. Box 5500, Chillocothe, OH 45601 on 12/6/19. Related document(s) #1 , #3 . (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Track DCM Initial Order. Chief Judge Patricia A. Gaughan. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Petitioner Rickey Jamison. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Ruiz. (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case, (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a person in state custody. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Rickey Jamison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Y,A) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.