Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/20/2020 at 09:36:51 (UTC).

James W. Turner Construction, LTD. v. Ryder & Ryder, LTD et al

Case Summary

On 08/21/2020 James W Turner Construction, LTD filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Ryder Ryder, LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01434

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James W. Turner Construction, LTD.

Defendants

Ryder & Ryder, LTD

Patrick B. Ryder

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios

1420 Fernandez Juncos Ave.

San Juan, PR 00909

Victor M. Rivera-Torres

1502 Fernandez Juncos Ave

Santurce, PR 00909

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Perez-Refojos

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

David Schexnaydre

2895 U.S. Hwy 190 #212

Mandeville, LA 70471

Mariacte Correa-Cestero

Attorney at O'Neill & Borges

250 Munoz Rivera Ave., Suite 800

San Juan, PR 00918-1813

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave and Motion Extension of Time until October 30, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Docket 15 Opposition to Motion to Remand as to #15 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor). Modified to Add MOTION for Leave to File Document on 10/5/2020 and edit docket title text. (mg). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition to Re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Courtand Request for Order to Pay Costs, Expenses and Attorney Fees filed by James W. Turner Construction, LTD. filed by All Defendants. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit docket title and event. (mg). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Stay the Motion to Dismiss until Determination on the Motion to Remand, or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to FIle Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD, MOTION for extension of time until October 24, 2020 to to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#12

(#12) Motion to allow David Schexnaydre to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7007476) filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 JWTC RYDER MSA

11 #2

Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 PRDOH JWTC AGREEMENT

11 #1

Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 PRDOH RFP

#11

(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Courtand Request for Order to Pay Costs, Expenses and Attorney Fees filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 PRDOH RFP, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 PRDOH JWTC AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 JWTC RYDER MSA)(Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of All Defendants (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Motion to allow David Schexnaydre to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7007476) filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

1 #4

Category Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, San Juan Part, case number SJ2020CV02631. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6991280), filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/13/2020. (lir) (Entered: 10/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave and Motion Extension of Time until October 30, 2020 to File Response/Reply to Docket 15 Opposition to Motion to Remand as to #15 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/16/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #15 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor). Modified to Add MOTION for Leave to File Document on 10/5/2020 and edit docket title text. (mg). (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE in Opposition to Re: #11 MOTION to Remand to State Courtand Request for Order to Pay Costs, Expenses and Attorney Fees filed by James W. Turner Construction, LTD. filed by All Defendants. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) Modified on 10/2/2020 to edit docket title and event. (mg). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 09/29/2020. (lir) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Stay the Motion to Dismiss until Determination on the Motion to Remand, or in the Alternative, Motion for Extension of Time to FIle Opposition to Motion to Dismiss re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD, MOTION for extension of time until October 24, 2020 to to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Motion to allow David Schexnaydre to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7007476) filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD Responses due by 10/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Courtand Request for Order to Pay Costs, Expenses and Attorney Fees filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. Responses due by 10/2/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 PRDOH RFP, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 PRDOH JWTC AGREEMENT, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 JWTC RYDER MSA)(Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory who has consented to the transfer. Signed by Chief Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/18/2020. (gr) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of All Defendants (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER re #6 Motion to Appear PHV: DENIED without prejudice. Mr. Schexnaydre must sign his petition; an electronic signature is not allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 09/04/2020. (brc) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to allow David Schexnaydre to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-7007476) filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD Responses due by 9/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER re #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer due September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/28/2020. (brc) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time until September 11, 2020 to File Answer or Otherwise Plead. filed by Daniel Perez-Refojos on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/11/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of James W. Turner Construction, LTD. (Rivera-Rios, Victor) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, San Juan Part, case number SJ2020CV02631. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6991280), filed by Patrick B. Ryder, Ryder & Ryder, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Category Sheet, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perez-Refojos, Daniel) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less