This case was last updated from PACER on 10/10/2021 at 07:22:51 (UTC).

People Of The State Of New York v. United Health Group Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 People Of The State Of New York filed an Other lawsuit against United Health Group Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann M Donnelly and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-04533

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ann M Donnelly

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Honorable Letitia James

People Of The State Of New York

Defendants

United Health Group, Inc.

United Behavioral Health

United Healthcare Insurance Company

Oxford Health Insurance, Inc.

Oxford Health Plans, LLC

Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc.

UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company of New York

UnitedHealthcare of New York, Inc.

United Health Group Incorporated

United Behavioral Health doing business as Optumhealth Behavioral Solutions

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael David Reisman

Attorney at NYS Office of The Attorney General

153 East 53Rd Street

New York, NY 10022

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher Flynn

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Honor Rose Costello

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

590 Madison Ave, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Jennifer Salzman Romano

Attorney at Crowell & Moring

515 S. Flower Street, Ste 40Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Michael W. Lieberman

Attorney at Crowell & Moring LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Flynn on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#14

(#14) Letter re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Flynn by Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans, LLC, United Behavioral Health, United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company of New York, UnitedHealthcare of New York, Inc. (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Lieberman on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Lieberman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Salzman Romano on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Romano, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

11 #2

Certificates of Good Standing

11 #1

Affidavit by Christopher Flynn

11 #11

Main Document

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit of Jennifer S. Romano

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

List of Defendants

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#3

ORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. #2 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York, #3 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/19/2021. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

#2

ORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. #2 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York, #3 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/19/2021. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketSTATUS REPORT ORDER As to the Status of this Case, and how it relates to the proposed settlements in 21 cv 4519 and 17 cv 4160, and to the fairness hearing scheduled for 12/16/21 in 17 cv 4160.Status Report due by 10/12/2021.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/6/2021. (Levy, Robert) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER RESPECTFULLY REFERRING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. #2 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York, #3 Settlement Agreement filed by People Of The State Of New York respectfully referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 9/19/2021. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Flynn on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/31/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter re #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Flynn by Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans, LLC, United Behavioral Health, United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company of New York, UnitedHealthcare of New York, Inc. (Flynn, Christopher) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #7 Joint Motion for Disclosure. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2021. (Levy, Robert) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Lieberman on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Lieberman, Michael) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Salzman Romano on behalf of All Defendants (notification declined or already on case) (Romano, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/30/2021. (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Flynn Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-14791474. by Oxford Health Insurance, Inc., Oxford Health Plans (NY), Inc., Oxford Health Plans, LLC, United Behavioral Health, United Health Group Incorporated, United Healthcare Insurance Company, UnitedHealthcare Insurance Company of New York, UnitedHealthcare of New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit by Christopher Flynn, #2 Certificates of Good Standing) (Flynn, Christopher) See #14 Certificate of Good Standing from DC Bar filed on 8/31/21. Modified, on 8/31/2021 (Marino, Janine). (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Disclosure of Claims Data by People Of The State Of New York. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by People Of The State Of New York. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 List of Defendants) (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy (as related to 17-cv-4160 and 21-cv-2791) for all further proceedings. Judge Pamela K. Chen, Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 8/16/2021. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case (17-CV-4160-AMD-RML). (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Taryn A. Merkl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Neptune, Pierre) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Letitia James (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Letitia James (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14743677 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Letitia James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Reisman, Michael) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UnitedHealthcare of New York, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oxford Health Plans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Oxford Health Insurance Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED HEALTH GROUP AND ASSOCIATES, LLC is a litigant