This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2020 at 11:00:39 (UTC).

James v. U. S. Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 James filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against U S Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Ray, II and Christopher C. Bly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01475

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Ray, II

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

George Samuel James

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondents

U. S. Department of Homeland Security

U. S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Filing Fee Paid: $ 75, receipt number GAN100121719 (ah) (ah). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) ORDER directing that Plaintiff must execute and return within 30 days, an Affidavit and Authorization allowing Custodian to withdraw funds from Inmate Account including an authorization allowing his custodian to withdraw funds from his custodial account and a properly completed certificate, signed by an authorized institutional officer, regarding the current balance in his custodial account or submit the remaining $395.00 he owes for the filing fee and administrative fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the balance of the filing fee or completed in forma pauperis form or at the expiration of the thirty-day period. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/14/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned and to submit the matter to the District Judge. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to update the cause of action to 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing, the nature of suit to 462 Naturalization Application, and the jurisdiction to U.S. Government Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 4/16/2020. (ah) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

#2

(#2) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit -Letter

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Appendix

1 #1

Memorandum in Support

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by George Samuel James. ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number GAN 108120649.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Filing Fee Paid: $ 75, receipt number GAN100121719 (ah) (ah). (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Memorandum of Materials for Relief Under Immigration and Nationality Act, by George Samuel James. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Memorandum, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16, #10 Exhibit 17, #11 Exhibit 18, #12 Exhibit 19, #13 Exhibit 20)(rvb) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by George Samuel James. (rvb) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #7 Order and Authorization and Affidavit form. (bdb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing that Plaintiff must execute and return within 30 days, an Affidavit and Authorization allowing Custodian to withdraw funds from Inmate Account including an authorization allowing his custodian to withdraw funds from his custodial account and a properly completed certificate, signed by an authorized institutional officer, regarding the current balance in his custodial account or submit the remaining $395.00 he owes for the filing fee and administrative fee. The Clerk is DIRECTED to forward the appropriate financial affidavit form to Plaintiff together with a copy of this Order. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the balance of the filing fee or completed in forma pauperis form or at the expiration of the thirty-day period. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/14/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Addendum to Supporting Memorandum re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by George Samuel James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A, #2 Exhibit 2A, #3 Exhibit 1B)(ah) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #5 Notice (Other). (ah) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/30/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to District Judge William M. Ray II. (ah) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly terminated. (ah) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #4 Order. (ah) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned and to submit the matter to the District Judge. The Clerk is further DIRECTED to update the cause of action to 8:1446 Petition for Naturalization Hearing, the nature of suit to 462 Naturalization Application, and the jurisdiction to U.S. Government Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 4/16/2020. (ah) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #3 Order. (rvb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Amended General Order 20-01 re COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/30/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to George Samuel James re #2 Order and NEF. (eop) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) GENERAL ORDER RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/16/20. (eop) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly. (eop) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by George Samuel James. ( Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number GAN 108120649.) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Appendix, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit -Letter)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less