This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2022 at 12:11:53 (UTC).

Matthew James v. Tiffany Music Academy

Case Summary

On 08/19/2022 Matthew James filed an Other lawsuit against Tiffany Music Academy. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-01551

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew James

Defendant

Tiffany Music Academy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Joseph Lawler

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Notice of Interested Parties

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2022
  • Docket(#10) FOR COURT USE ONLY: STATISTICAL CORRECTION: striking #7 REQUEST for Extension of Time re Order #9 . (lom) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docket(#9) ORDER IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: REQUEST to Extend Time to File and Proposed Order #7 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The document is stricken. L.R. 83-2.10.1 Corporation, Unincorporated Association, Partnership or Trust. A corporation including a limited liability corporation, a partnership including a limited liability partnership, an unincorporated association, or a trust may not appear in any action or proceeding pro se. (lom) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Filed Document RE: REQUEST to Extend Time to File Answer to 11/22/2022 #7 . The following error(s) was/were found: L.R. 83-2.10.1 Corporation, Unincorporated Association, Partnership or Trust. A corporation including a limited liability corporation, a partnership including a limited liability partnership, an unincorporated association, or a trust may not appear in any action or proceeding pro se. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) (Entered: 09/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • Docket(#7) STRICKEN, see docket entry no. 9 - REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Tiffany Music Academy. (Attachments: #1 [Prop] Order) (lom) Modified on 9/29/2022 (lom). (Entered: 09/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Matthew James. upon Tiffany Music Academy waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/24/2022, answer due 10/24/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Tiffany Bobb. (Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 2 Notice of Interested Parties should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#4) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (lh) (Entered: 08/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Fee Exemption in accordance with statute, filed by Plaintiff Matthew James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties) (Attorney Brian Joseph Lawler added to party Matthew James(pty:pla))(Lawler, Brian) (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less