This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2020 at 08:45:58 (UTC).

James v. Sysco Corporation

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 James filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Sysco Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred H Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-03643

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred H Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rasheda James

Defendant

Sysco Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alfonso Kennard, Jr.

Attorney at KENNARD LAW

5120 Woodway Dr. Suite 10010

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Peter Justin Stuhldreher

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Paul M. Knettel

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sysco Corporation, filed.(Knettel, Paul) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sysco Corporation, filed.(Stuhldreher, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sysco Corporation served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rasheda James, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rasheda James, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysco Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25403506) filed by Rasheda James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sysco Corporation, filed.(Knettel, Paul) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sysco Corporation, filed.(Stuhldreher, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sysco Corporation served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rasheda James, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Rasheda James, filed.(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Sysco Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25403506) filed by Rasheda James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kennard, Alfonso) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less