This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2021 at 09:15:26 (UTC).

Tyrone James v. National Express Transit Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2020 Tyrone James filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against National Express Transit Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-02605

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tyrone James

Defendants

National Express Transit Corporation

DOES 1 through 10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ronald Leornardo Zambrano

Attorney at West Coast Employment Lawyers

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Neama Rahmani

Attorney at West Coast Trial Lawyers APLC

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3325

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorneys

Eric W May

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jamie C. Pollaci

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3021

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit 1-2

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (npo) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Compliance With 28 U.S.C. Section 1446(d) filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (May, Eric) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, Inclusive, National Express Transit Corporation. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tyrone James. Filed in State Court on 9/10/2020 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation, identifying 1. Plaintiff Tyrone James. 2. Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. 3. Defendant National Express Transit Corporation 4. The sole member of National Express LLC is NE Durham UK Limited. (May, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Don Swain re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (May, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Eric W. May re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (May, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (May, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court, County of San Bernardino, case number CIVDS2019779 Receipt No: ACACDC-29582627 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant National Express Transit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2) (Attorney Eric W May added to party National Express Transit Corporation(pty:dft))(May, Eric) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL EXPRESS TRANSIT CORPORATION, A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald L Zambrano

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neama Rahmani