This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:02:31 (UTC).

James v. Menard, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/24/2021 James filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Menard, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is M. Douglas Harpool. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-03163

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M. Douglas Harpool

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Jeremy James

Defendant

Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond Lampert

2847 S. Ingram Mill Rd.Ste. A-100

Springfield, MO 65804

Defendant Attorney

Joshua L. Mareschal

Attorney at McAnany, Van Cleave & Phillips

1546 E. Bradford Parkwaysuite 100

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

MAP General Order

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

6 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of filing Memorandum of Law by Menard, Inc. re #5 MOTION to dismiss case or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Mareschal, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to dismiss case or, in the Alternative, to Stay Proceedings Pending Arbitration filed by Joshua L. Mareschal on behalf of Menard, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/2/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Mareschal, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of appearance by Joshua L. Mareschal on behalf of Menard, Inc. (Attorney Joshua L. Mareschal added to party Menard, Inc.(pty:dft))(Mareschal, Joshua) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by William Jeremy James. Waiver sent to Menard, Inc. on 6/25/2021, answer due 8/24/2021. (Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Menard, Inc. filed by Raymond Lampert on behalf of William Jeremy James. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7469075. Service due by 9/22/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lampert, Raymond) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Menard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Lee Mareschal