This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2020 at 07:42:42 (UTC).

James v. Federal Bureau of Prisons

Case Summary

On 12/16/2019 James filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Federal Bureau of Prisons. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00117

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kenneth James

Folkston, GA 31537

Respondents

Federal Bureau of Prisons

Tracy Johns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Bradford Collins Patrick

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970

Savannah, GA 31412

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Envelope

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit A - BOP Public Information Inmate Data

#6

#5

2 #1

USM-285 Forms

#2

1 #9

Envelope

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #7

*Restricted*

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 2/5/2020. (csr) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kenneth James. Responses due by 2/17/2020. (Attachment: #1 Envelope). REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (csr) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 1/30/2020. (csr) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Directing Petitioner to file any objections to the Respondent's #6 motion for dismissal or to otherwise inform the Court of his decision not to object to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 1/16/2020. (csr) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Dismiss. (csr) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Tracy Johns. Responses due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BOP Public Information Inmate Data)(Patrick, Bradford) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the Attorney General of the United States for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth James, and #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, served on 12/31/2019. Cert mail returned signed by E. Sase on 12/31/19. (csr) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Tracy Johns answer due 1/20/2020. (csr) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia, Civil Process Clerk for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth James and #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, served on 12/30/2019. Cert mail returned signed by Rosa Oates on 12/30/19.(csr) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) U.S. Marshal Return Executed as to Tracy Johns for #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kenneth James and #2 Order Directing USMS Service of Process, served on 12/30/2019. Cert mail returned signed by Spike on 12/30/19. (csr) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Directing USMS Service of Process upon: (1) the Attorney General of the United States; (2) the named Respondent; and (3) the civil process clerk at the office of the United States Attorney for the Southern District of Georgia. The Court orders Respondent to show cause, in writing, why Petitioner's writ should not be granted by filing an Answer within 21 days of service of the Petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Forms) (MG) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • DocketFiling fee payment received: Amount- $5.00, receipt number BWK008959. (MG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kenneth James. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Envelope) (MG) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Federal Bureau of Prisons is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bradford Collins Patrick