This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 07:45:52 (UTC).

James v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 James filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Mac R. McCoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00869

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Mac R. McCoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kizzie James

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Interested Party

SSA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jonas H. Kushner

Attorney at Kushner & Kushner

2121 W First St, Po Box 2200

Ft Myers, FL 33902

 

Court Documents

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/9/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/26/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency, construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this case without requiring prepayment of fees or costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with a complete set of the following forms: (a) AO 440 (or equivalent) Summons in a Civil Action form; and (b) United States Marshals Form 285. No later than 12/31/2019, Plaintiff must prepare and return the completed service documents, along with sufficient copies of the original Complaint, to the Clerk of Court for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk of Court, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/10/2019. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/6/2019. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 07/08/2015. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to Commissioner of Social Security. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) US Marshal 285 form for service via U.S. Certified Mail as to Attorney General of the United States. (MLJ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 1/9/2020. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/26/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RMT) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases is NOT per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kizzie James. Related case(s): no (Kushner, Jonas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Affidavit of Indigency, construed as a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file all pleadings in this case without requiring prepayment of fees or costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide Plaintiff with a complete set of the following forms: (a) AO 440 (or equivalent) Summons in a Civil Action form; and (b) United States Marshals Form 285. No later than 12/31/2019, Plaintiff must prepare and return the completed service documents, along with sufficient copies of the original Complaint, to the Clerk of Court for service by the United States Marshals Service. Upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Clerk of Court, the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/10/2019. (McCoy, Mac) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/6/2019. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER in re: courtesy paper copies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 07/08/2015. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docket(#3) ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 07/23/2010. (RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Kizzie James. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Kizzie James. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less