This case was last updated from PACER on 04/24/2021 at 07:58:46 (UTC).

James-Gumbs v. American Airlines, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 James-Gumbs filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against American Airlines, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rachel P. Kovner and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00976

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rachel P. Kovner

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carol James

Carol James-Gumbs

Defendants and Cross Claimants

ABM Aviation, Inc.

ABM Janitorial Services - Northeast, Inc.

American Airlines, Inc. (incorrectly designated as American Airlines, Inc. d/b/a American Airlines Cargo)

Defendant and Cross Defendant

American Airlines, Inc. (incorrectly designated as American Airlines, Inc. d/b/a American Airlines Cargo)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anthony A. Ferrante

Attorney at Levine and Wiss, PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike, Suite 206

West Hempstead, NY 11552

Wayne B. Wilson

Attorney at Levine and Wiss, PLLC

510 Hempstead Turnpike, Ste 206

W. Hempstead, NY 11552

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Nicole Marie Battisti

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney LLP

120 Broadway, Suite 1010

New York, NY 10271

Kateryna Stupnevich

Attorney at Morrison Mahoney

Wall Street Plaza, 88 Pine Street, Ste 1900

New York, NY 10005

Nathan Bohlander

Attorney at Morgan & Akins

30 South 15Th Street, Suite 701

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Ross Barbour

Attorney at Wilson Elser Mokowitz Edelman & Dicker

150 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Nathan Bohlander

Attorney at Morgan & Akins

30 South 15Th Street, Suite 701

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Ross Barbour

Attorney at Wilson Elser Mokowitz Edelman & Dicker

150 East 42Nd Street

New York, NY 10017

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Punitive Damages by ABM Aviation, Inc. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#21

(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Joint Scheduling Order by American Airlines, Inc. (Barbour, Ross) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#20

(#20) Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Barbour, Ross) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to ABM Aviation, Inc. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/16/2021. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the 4/1/2021 Telephone Conference is rescheduled to 4/22/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 4/15/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/11/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to American Airlines, Inc. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/16/2021. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/1/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 3/25/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/25/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION For Named Defendant by American Airlines, Inc. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibits A-F

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: As discussed during the 4/22/2021 conference, any joinder and/or amendments of the pleadings must be made by 7/30/2021. The names, qualifications and area(s) of expertise of initial experts shall beserved on or before 9/30/2021. Initial expert witness reports shall be served on or before 10/29/2021. All discovery must be completed by 1/14/2022. On or before 1/14/2022, the Parties will file a joint status report letter confirming that discovery is complete. On or before 2/25/2022, the Parties will initiate any dispositive motions in accordance with the Individual Rules of the District Judge. On or before 3/31/2022, the Parties will file their joint Proposed Pretrial Order. A Telephone Conference is set for 9/16/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. On or before 9/9/2021, the Parties will file a joint status report letter, of no more than three pages, identifying any outstanding discovery disputes. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 4/22/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Telephone Conference held on 4/22/2021. Wayne B. Wilson appearing for Plaintiff. Ross Barbour and Kateryna Stupnevich appearing for Defendants. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (FTR Log #4:21-4:50.) (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER: The #22 Stipulation of Dismissal of Punitive Damages is so-ordered. Ordered by Rachel P. Kovner on 4/22/2021. (Herrera, Isaiah) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Punitive Damages by ABM Aviation, Inc. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Proposed Scheduling Order Initial Joint Scheduling Order by American Airlines, Inc. (Barbour, Ross) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Amended ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), CROSSCLAIM against American Airlines, Inc. by ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABM Aviation, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ABM Industries Incorporated for ABM Aviation, Inc.. (Stupnevich, Kateryna) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by American Airlines, Inc.. (Barbour, Ross) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to ABM Aviation, Inc. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/16/2021. RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the 4/1/2021 Telephone Conference is rescheduled to 4/22/2021 at 4:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The Parties are to refer to #8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 4/15/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/11/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to American Airlines, Inc. Defendant's deadline to answer the Complaint or otherwise move is extended to 3/16/2021. SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, a Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/1/2021 at 12:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon. The Parties must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 3/25/2021. The Parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Please do not use the speaker function on your phone, remember to identify yourselves every time you speak, and speak slowly and deliberately for purposes of the record. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 2/25/2021. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by American Airlines, Inc.. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION Stipulation to Strike Punitive Damages Without Prejudice by American Airlines, Inc. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION For Named Defendant by American Airlines, Inc. (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Bohlander on behalf of American Airlines, Inc. (notification declined or already on case) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketThis case has been opened in the Eastern District of New York. If you plan to continue representing your client(s), you must be admitted to practice before this court. You must do so by applying for Pro Hac Vice or permanent admission. To apply for Pro Hac Vice admission, you must first register for an ECF login and password. Please visit the Court's website at www.nyed.uscourts.gov/attorney-admissions for guidance. Once registered, you must electronically file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You must pay the required pro hac vice fee online. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Airlines, Inc. from Supreme Court of Kings County, case number 523651/2020. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANYEDC-14188044) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-F) (Bohlander, Nathan) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABM Janitorial Services Northeast, inc is a litigant

Latest cases where ABM AVIATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN AIRLINES INC, FKA US Airways is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NATHAN R. BOHLANDER