This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/27/2022 at 08:06:58 (UTC).

Kummerfeldt et al v. Walmart, Inc

Case Summary

On 12/29/2021 Kummerfeldt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00162

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Kummerfeldt, Individually and as parent, guardian and next friend of N.K., a minor

Brandi Pike, Individually and as parent, guardian and next friend of N.K., a minor

James Kummerfeldt

Brandi Pike

Defendants

Walmart, Inc.

Walmart, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Galvin

Attorney at Michael J Galvin

4950 38Th Avenue

Moline, IL 61265

Clarissa Rietveld

Attorney at VanDerGinst Law PC

300 Walnut Street, Suite 6

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin M Weston

Attorney at Lederer Weston & Craig PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#14

(#14) ANSWER and Jury Demand re #2 State Court Petition by Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) Modified text on 2/24/2022 (des) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

#13

(#13) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2023 08:30 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2023 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 2/18/2022. (kms) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER: Upon consent of the parties James Kummerfeldt, Brandi Pike, Walmart, Inc, this case is assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly KE Mahoney for final disposition. SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 3/18/2022 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 6/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 10/7/2022. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 12/9/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 1/6/2023. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Motions due by 4/7/2023. Trial Ready Deadline 10/2/2023. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/18/2022. (jjh) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#11

(#11) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2022. Parties consent to a United States Magistrate Judge. Scheduling Order and Trial Management Order to follow. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (kms) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

9 #1

Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Galvin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3626410) by Plaintiff James Kummerfeldt (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Galvin, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate by Defendant Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarissa Rietveld on behalf of James Kummerfeldt. (Rietveld, Clarissa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

5 #1

*Restricted*

#5

(#5) DOCKET Annotation Please find Civil Removal Action new case packet attached (eGalvin) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2021: #1 Email Confirmation Receipt) (jlh). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/31/2022 (eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to Attorney Michael Galvin Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court For the Northern District of Iowa. Admissions due by 1/13/2022 (eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#2

(#2) STATE Court Petition by James Kummerfeldt and Brandi Pike (NEF eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER and Jury Demand re #2 State Court Petition by Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) Modified text on 2/24/2022 (des) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TRIAL Management Order: Witness and exhibit lists exchanged by parties (but not filed) at least 21 days before FPTC. Exhibits marked. Jury Instructions 3 days before FPTC. Motions in limine 21 days before FPTC. Jury Trial set for 10/10/2023 09:00 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2023 08:30 AM in Ctrm 1 (2nd Floor) Cedar Rapids before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2023 01:30 PM in Telephonic Hearing before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2023. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 2/18/2022. (kms) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: Upon consent of the parties James Kummerfeldt, Brandi Pike, Walmart, Inc, this case is assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly KE Mahoney for final disposition. SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 3/18/2022 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 6/3/2022. Amended Pleadings due by 6/3/2022. Plaintiffs Expert Witness due by 10/7/2022. Defendants Expert Witnesses due by 12/9/2022. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Experts due by 1/6/2023. Discovery due by 3/3/2023. Motions due by 4/7/2023. Trial Ready Deadline 10/2/2023. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 2/18/2022. (jjh) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac for Attorney Michael J Galvin on behalf of James Kummerfeldt and Brandi Pike. Upon review of the motion and certificate of good standing, the court finds the motion should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 2/18/2022. (jlh) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Rule 16(b) and 26(f) Scheduling Conference held on 2/17/2022. Parties consent to a United States Magistrate Judge. Scheduling Order and Trial Management Order to follow. Official Court Record: FTR Gold (kms) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael J. Galvin ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number AIANDC-3626410) by Plaintiff James Kummerfeldt (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing) (Galvin, Michael) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • Docket(#8) ** TEXT ORDER ONLY ** Setting Hearing - Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 10:30 AM (Telephonic Hearing - please use dial-in hearing instructions to participate) before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The hearing will take place using the Court's conference bridge. The parties shall access the hearing by: (1) calling 877-336-1831, (2) enter access code 3495185 #, (3) press # to enter as a participant, (4) enter security code 1831 #. The call will become active upon the host (the Court) entering the conference bridge. Signed by United States Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 02/14/2022. (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan and Consent To Proceed Before A Magistrate by Defendant Walmart, Inc (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Clarissa Rietveld on behalf of James Kummerfeldt. (Rietveld, Clarissa) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketSet Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 1/20/2022 (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DOCKET Annotation Please find Civil Removal Action new case packet attached (eGalvin) (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/30/2021: #1 Email Confirmation Receipt) (jlh). (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 1/31/2022 (eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to Attorney Michael Galvin Not Admitted to Practice in the United States District Court For the Northern District of Iowa. Admissions due by 1/13/2022 (eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATE Court Petition by James Kummerfeldt and Brandi Pike (NEF eGalvin) (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketChief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney added. No conflicts identified. (jlh) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from Linn County District Court, case number LACV098445. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AIANDC-3592103), filed by Walmart, Inc.. Scheduling Report due by 2/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement) (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston