This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2023 at 08:25:48 (UTC).

James H Fontenot Construction Inc v. X L Specialty Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 James H Fontenot Construction Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against X L Specialty Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James H Fontenot Construction Inc

Defendant

X L Specialty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucas Henry Morehouse

Defendant Attorneys

Virginia Y Dodd

Kevin William Welsh

Jeffrey Scott Knighton, Jr

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Cade Richard Cole

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2022-4089 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5471797) filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit "A", Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit "B", State Court Record)(Attorney Kevin William Welsh added to party XL Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Welsh, Kevin) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit "A", Complaint for Damages

1 #3

Exhibit "B", State Court Record

#2

(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/24/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

3 #1

Exhibit A

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #3

Additional Neutrals

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/10/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/10/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by X L Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

6 #1

Proposed order Proposed Order

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. X L Specialty Insurance Co answer due 3/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/8/2023. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

#8

(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X L Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance of America, Inc, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA XL Group for X L Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Welsh, Kevin) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 4/5/2023. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 04/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by X L Specialty Insurance Co.(aty,Welsh, Kevin) (Entered: 03/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by X L Specialty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance of America, Inc, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc., Corporate Parent XL Group Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA XL Group for X L Specialty Insurance Co. (aty,Welsh, Kevin) (Entered: 03/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. X L Specialty Insurance Co answer due 3/22/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 3/8/2023. (crt,Jones, P) (Entered: 03/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotions Transferred regarding #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent . Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, with consent by X L Specialty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order Proposed Order)(aty,Knighton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 3/10/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal sent to Kevin William Welsh on behalf of X L Specialty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 3/10/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/23/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Additional Neutrals)(crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/24/2023. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATE COURT Service Returned Executed. X L Specialty Insurance Co answer due 3/2/2023. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to #1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of Removal from 14th JDC Calcasieu Parish, Case Number 2022-4089 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5471797) filed by XL Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit "A", Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit "B", State Court Record)(Attorney Kevin William Welsh added to party XL Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft))(aty,Welsh, Kevin) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less