This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/20/2023 at 10:48:28 (UTC).

James et al v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/21/2022 James filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Freedom Mortgage Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon Phipps McCalla and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02811

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Anice Terrell

James Terrell

Defendants

Freedom Mortgage Corporation

The Federal Savings Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L. Dan Buchanan

Attorney at RALSTON BUCHANAN, PLLC

2670 Union Avenue Extended, Ste 1228

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD

424 Church St. Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37219

Shaun Kevin Ramey

Attorney at MCGLINCHEY STAFFORD PLLC

424 Church Street, Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anice Terrell, James Terrell (Buchanan, L. Dan) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

14 #6

Exhibit 5 - Second Response to Notice of Error

14 #5

Exhibit 4 - First Response to Notice of Error

14 #4

Exhibit 3 - Designated Address

14 #3

Exhibit 2 - Tax Relief Program

14 #2

Exhibit 1 - Deed of Trust

14 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, 1/31/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#12

(#12) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Freedom Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/9/2023. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/3/2023. (crh) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Kevin Ramey on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

8 #1

summons

8 #8

Main Document

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Anice Terrell, James Terrell (Buchanan, L. Dan) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit 2 - Tax Relief Program, #4 Exhibit 3 - Designated Address, #5 Exhibit 4 - First Response to Notice of Error, #6 Exhibit 5 - Second Response to Notice of Error)(Ronderos, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for Tuesday, 1/31/2023 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. To access the telephonic conference parties will dial 888-675-2535 and enter access code 7360481. Please call at least 5 minutes in advance of the conference time. (jrs) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Freedom Mortgage Corporation answer due 1/9/2023. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/3/2023. (crh) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Shaun Kevin Ramey on behalf of Freedom Mortgage Corporation (Ramey, Shaun) (Entered: 12/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (proposed order submitted) by Freedom Mortgage Corporation. (Ronderos, Joseph) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Freedom Mortgage Corporation, The Federal Savings Bank. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (Attachments: #1 summons)(jae) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Summons by L. Dan Buchanan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Buchanan, L. Dan) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons by L. Dan Buchanan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Buchanan, L. Dan) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 11/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for RESPA Violations against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATNWDC-4018727), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buchanan, L. Dan) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Freedom Mortgage Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shaun K Ramey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph V. Ronderos, Jr