This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2021 at 08:24:29 (UTC).

JAMES-EL v. HOOKS et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 JAMES-EL filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against HOOKS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOE L. WEBSTER and LORETTA C. BIGGS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOE L. WEBSTER

Presiding Judge

LORETTA C. BIGGS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL

Asheville, NC 28804

Defendants

C. STARLING

MACRE R. CRIDER

MONICA BOND

ERIK A. HOOKS

PAULA JONES

STEPHEN R. HOLCOMB

NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY - DAC

RADASEVIC

J. HELMS

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021 (Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

5 #1

Envelope - Front and Back

#5

(#5) OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. Response to Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 7/6/2021. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/16/2021; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

2 #4

Envelope - Front and Back

2 #3

Declaration of Objection

2 #2

Declaration Request

2 #1

Cover Letter

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration Request, #3 Declaration of Objection, #4 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#1

(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Transfer Case by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. Response to Motion due by 7/16/2021 (Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) OBJECTION TO RECOMMENDED RULING - MAGISTRATE JUDGE re #3 Recommended Ruling - Magistrate Judge, by Plaintiff HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. Response to Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Envelope - Front and Back)(Taylor, Abby) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Mailing Recommendation. Objections to R&R due by 6/30/2021. Objections to R&R for Pro Se due by 7/6/2021. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #1 Motion for Application to Proceed IFP. Signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/16/2021. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER AND RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE signed by MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER on 6/16/2021; ORDERED that in forma pauperis status is granted for the sole purpose of entering this Order and Recommendation. The Clerk is instructed to send Plaintiff 1983 forms, instructions, an application to proceed in forma pauperis, and a copy of pertinent parts of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8 (i.e., Sections (a) & (d)). RECOMMENDED that this action be filed and dismissed sua sponte without prejudice to Plaintiff filing a new complaint, on the proper 1983 forms, which corrects the defects cited above. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED for Screening. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAG/JUDGE JOE L. WEBSTER. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Declaration Request, #3 Declaration of Objection, #4 Envelope - Front and Back) (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION to Proceed IFP by HARRY SHAROD JAMES-EL. (Hicks, Samantha) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH CAROLINA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY is a litigant