This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2020 at 07:54:41 (UTC).

James Andrews et al v. Conversion Squared Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 James Andrews filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Conversion Squared Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James Andrews

Jesse Brister

Ryan Abel

Barbara Chatfield

Jung Kim

Michael Babich

Yolanda Sanchez

Robert Chatfield

Angela Neilson

Defendants

Conversion Squared Corporation

Does 1-100

Does 1-10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Clark Robert Conforti

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Suite D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Timothy J Walton

Attorney at Walton Twu LLP

9515 Soquel Drive Suite 207

Aptos, CA 95003

David J McGlothlin

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

2221 Camino Del Rio South Suite 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Jimmie Chin Twu

Attorney at Walton Twu LLP

9515 Soquel Drive Suite 207

Aptos, CA 95003

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Unit D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel A Solitro

Attorney at Lock Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nasar M Khan

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Charles E Phipps

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Firs

#18

17 #1

Appendix

#17

16 #1

Certificate of Service

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

#1

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING AS MOOT Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #12 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiffs filed a first amended complaint (Doc. #17 ), which Defendant has moved to dismiss (Doc. #18 ). Accordingly, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12) is DENIED AS MOOT. (jp) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 2-5 days, filed by Plaintiffs Ryan Abel, James Andrews, Michael Babich, Jesse Brister, Barbara Chatfield, Robert Chatfield, Jung Kim, Angela Neilson, Yolanda Sanchez.. (Conforti, Clark) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 5/8/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint) (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiffs Barbara Chatfield, Jesse Brister, Robert Chatfield, Angela Neilson, Ryan Abel, Jung Kim, James Andrews, Michael Babich, Yolanda Sanchez (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Conforti, Clark) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian counsel for Plaintiffs Ryan Abel, James Andrews, Michael Babich, Jesse Brister, Barbara Chatfield, Robert Chatfield. Adding Abbas Kazerounian as counsel of record for Plaintiffs James Andrews, Ryan Abel, Jesse Brister, Michael Babich, Yolanda Sanchez, Barbara Chatfield, Robert Chatfield, Jung Kim, and Angela Neilson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiffs James Andrews, Ryan Abel, Jesse Brister, Michael Babich, Yolanda Sanchez, Barbara Chatfield, Robert Chatfield, Jung Kim, and Angela Neilson. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Ryan Abel(pty:pla), Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party James Andrews(pty:pla), Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Michael Babich(pty:pla), Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Jesse Brister(pty:pla), Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Barbara Chatfield(pty:pla), Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party Robert Chatfield(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Barbara Chatfield, Jesse Brister, Robert Chatfield, Angela Neilson, Ryan Abel, Jung Kim, James Andrews, Michael Babich, Yolanda Sanchez, upon Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wyoming Agency Services, Inc., Tammy Bourne /Authorized Person in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Conforti, Clark) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER by Judge Josephine L. Staton: granting #11 Non-Resident Attorney Charles E Phipps APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation, designating Daniel A Solitro as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 4/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. Motion set for hearing on 4/10/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles E. Phipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-25330726) filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Application Of Non-Resident Attorney To Appear In A Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation, re Notice of Related Case(s) #4 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 served on February 7, 2020. (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Charles E Phipps for Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED E-FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Conversion Squared Corporation, Does 1-100. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Barbara Chatfield, Jesse Brister, Robert Chatfield, Angela Neilson, Ryan Abel, Jung Kim, James Andrews, Michael Babich, Yolanda Sanchez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/6/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation, (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. (Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2019-01110405 Receipt No: 0973-25282412 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Conversion Squared Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint) (Attorney Daniel A Solitro added to party Conversion Squared Corporation(pty:dft))(Solitro, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nasar M Khan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles Edward Phipps

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Anthony Solitro