This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 11:09:31 (UTC).

JAMERSON v. CLEMMONS et al

Case Summary

On 03/27/2019 JAMERSON filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against CLEMMONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY and LACEY A COLLIER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00522

  • Filing Date:

    03/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY

Presiding Judge

LACEY A COLLIER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON

Milton, FL 32583

Defendants

DICE

JOSHUA B UNRUH

OAKES

SANTIAGO

CHEPULT

PUGH

HITE

NORRIS

HARRIS

WALKER CLEMMONS

SANTA ROSA MEDICAL DEPARTMENT

MCKENNON

C J PRATT

MOSS

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) USCA ORDER IN LIEU OF MANDATE as to #11 Notice of Appeal.appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. ( 30 Day Deadline After Appeal Mandate set for destruction of working file 8/1/2019.) (alb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#14

(#14) USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER and USCA Case Number 19-12241D for #11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. USCA Appeal # 19-12241-D. (alb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#13

(#13) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal. (alb) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/12/2019 with corrected document) (alb). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#12

(#12) Appeal Instructions re: #11 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 6/26/2019. (alb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

#10

(#10) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. 90 Day Deadline set for destruction of working file. 8/6/2019 (alb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER ADOPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), this cause is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs initiating a new cause of action accompanied by payment of the $400.00 filing fee in its entirety. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 5/8/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#8

(#8) Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to #7 Report and Recommendations by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#7

(#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), this cause be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's initiating a new cause of action accompanied by payment of the $400.00 filing fee in its entirety. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/29/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/28/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE to the Court, by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis anda Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. Within 30 days from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Order and forms mailed.)( Fee due by 5/3/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/3/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CHEPULT, WALKER CLEMMONS, DICE, HARRIS, HITE, MCKENNON, MOSS, NORRIS, OAKES, C J PRATT, PUGH, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, SANTIAGO, JOSHUA B UNRUH, filed by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (No service copies.) (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines re #11 Notice of Appeal : Clerk to check status of Appeal on 9/26/2019. USCA Appeal # 19-12241-D. (alb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) USCA ORDER IN LIEU OF MANDATE as to #11 Notice of Appeal.appeal is DISMISSED for failure to pay the filing and docketing fees to the district court within the time fixed by the rules. ( 30 Day Deadline After Appeal Mandate set for destruction of working file 8/1/2019.) (alb) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER and USCA Case Number 19-12241D for #11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. USCA Appeal # 19-12241-D. (alb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #11 Notice of Appeal. (alb) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/12/2019 with corrected document) (alb). (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Appeal Instructions re: #11 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 6/26/2019. (alb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #10 Clerk's Judgment, #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation, by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #9 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. 90 Day Deadline set for destruction of working file. 8/6/2019 (alb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER ADOPTING #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), this cause is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs initiating a new cause of action accompanied by payment of the $400.00 filing fee in its entirety. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 5/8/2019. (alb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, #8 Objection to Report and Recommendations. (alb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Plaintiff's OBJECTIONS to #7 Report and Recommendations by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Recommended that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g), this cause be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff's initiating a new cause of action accompanied by payment of the $400.00 filing fee in its entirety. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/29/2019. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 5/28/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #5 Notice to the Court, #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE to the Court, by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER DENYING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk shall send Plaintiff a motion to proceed in forma pauperis anda Prisoner Consent Form and Financial Certificate. Within 30 days from the date of docketing of this order Plaintiff must either (1) pay the $400.00 filing fee, or (2) submit a completed motion to proceed in forma pauperis. (Order and forms mailed.)( Fee due by 5/3/2019.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 4/3/2019. (alb) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • (#3) Notice to Pro Se Litigant. (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against CHEPULT, WALKER CLEMMONS, DICE, HARRIS, HITE, MCKENNON, MOSS, NORRIS, OAKES, C J PRATT, PUGH, SANTA ROSA MEDICAL DEPARTMENT, SANTIAGO, JOSHUA B UNRUH, filed by JOHNSON CHRISTOPHER JAMERSON. (No service copies.) (alb) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less