This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2022 at 08:27:52 (UTC).

Jakhete v. TAVLARIOS et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2022 Jakhete filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TAVLARIOS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are K. Michael Moore and Ryon M. McCabe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-14158

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

K. Michael Moore

Referral Judge

Ryon M. McCabe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanjeev Jakhete

Defendants

John TAVLARIOS

Global Water Investments, LLC.

Aqua Pulsar, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John Francis Bradley

Attorney at Bradley Legal Group, P.A.

1217 East Broward Blvd

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Defendant Attorneys

Edward Maurice Mullins

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131-2847

Ana Maria Barton

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Wesley Andrew Butensky

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit EX A

1 #3

Summon(s) Aqua Pulsar

1 #4

Summon(s) Global Water Investments

1 #5

Summon(s) Tavlarios

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS. (nan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (None Disclosed) by Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC. (Butensky, Wesley) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, by Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party Aqua Pulsar, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/8/2022 (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Complaint, by Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS. Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party Aqua Pulsar, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ana Maria Barton added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/8/2022 (Barton, Ana) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (None Disclosed) by Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC. (Butensky, Wesley) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketReset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Aqua Pulsar, LLC. response/answer due 6/24/2022; Global Water Investments, LLC. response/answer due 6/24/2022; John TAVLARIOS response/answer due 6/24/2022. PER DE# 9 . (cds) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. #8 . Therein, Defendants request a four-week extension of time, up to and including June 24, 2022, to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint because Defendants have just retained counsel, who requires additional time to research the allegations in the Complaint. Id. at 1-2. Plaintiff does not oppose the Motion. Id. at 2. The Court finds good cause to grant Defendants' timely request for an extension of time. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b). Accordingly, UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #8 is GRANTED. Defendants may respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before June 24, 2022. This Order does not affect any other deadlines. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/26/2022. (elm) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS. Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Aqua Pulsar, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party Global Water Investments, LLC.(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Maurice Mullins added to party John TAVLARIOS(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mullins, Edward) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe on 5/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#6) PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE RYON M. MCCABE. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Judge Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge McCabe's discovery procedures. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/5/2022. (elm) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. The parties are hereby on notice that this Court requires all filings to be formatted in 12 point Times New Roman font and double spaced, including any footnotes, with one inch margins on all sides. Failure to follow these formatting guidelines may result in the filing being stricken, any opposing filing being granted by default, and the imposition of other sanctions, including attorney's fees and costs. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. The parties shall seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing.... Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted). Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three (3) days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 5/5/2022. (elm) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Aqua Pulsar, LLC., Global Water Investments, LLC., John TAVLARIOS. (nan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Ryon M. McCabe is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Martin (Office - Ft Pierce) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nan) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Aqua Pulsar, LLC, Global Water Investments, LLC, John TAVLARIOS. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-15613029, filed by Sanjeev Jakhete. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit EX A, #3 Summon(s) Aqua Pulsar, #4 Summon(s) Global Water Investments, #5 Summon(s) Tavlarios)(Bradley, John) (Entered: 05/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ana Maria Barton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward M. Mullins