This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:01:41 (UTC).

Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust v. Old Dominion National Bank

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Old Dominion National Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and T. S. Ellis, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01161

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

T. S. Ellis, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust

Defendant

Old Dominion National Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Bernard Schroeder

Attorney at Shulman Rogers Gandal Pordy & Ecker PA (Potomac)

12505 Park Potomac Avenue, Sixth Floor

Potomac, MD 20854

Defendant Attorneys

Edward W. Cameron

Attorney at Cameron McEvoy PLLC

4100 Monument Corner Dr, Suite 420

Fairfax, VA 22030

Matthew H. Sorensen

Attorney at Cameron McEvoy PLLC

4100 Monument Corner Dr, Suite 420

Fairfax, VA 22030

Richard Glenn Cole, III

Attorney at Cameron McEvoy PLLC

4100 Monument Corner Dr, Suite 420

Fairfax, VA 22030

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Glenn Cole, III on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Cole, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Exhibit

#14

(#14) Opposition to #11 Memorandum in Support, #13 Notice of Hearing Date, #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Schroeder, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#13

(#13) Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/18/2020 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#12

(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

11 #3

Exhibit C

11 #2

Exhibit B

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Sorensen on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Sorensen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Cameron on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust Old Dominion National Bank served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020 (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Kristin E. Draper. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/05/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 #1

Notice

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristin E. Draper and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Schroeder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7428628. by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Glenn Cole, III on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Cole, Richard) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Opposition to #11 Memorandum in Support, #13 Notice of Hearing Date, #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Schroeder, William) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III. (clar, ) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #10 MOTION to Dismiss. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Hearing Date set for 12/18/2020 re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Old Dominion National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION to Dismiss by Old Dominion National Bank. (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew H. Sorensen on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Sorensen, Matthew) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward W. Cameron on behalf of Old Dominion National Bank (Cameron, Edward) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust Old Dominion National Bank served on 10/6/2020, answer due 10/27/2020 (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Kristin E. Draper. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/05/2020. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Old Dominion National Bank. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kristin E. Draper and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Schroeder Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7428628. by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7428567.), filed by Sanjiv Jain, Trustee, Sanjiv Jain Living Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schroeder, William) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less